Ekstedt v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robert Ekstedt
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00084
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/21/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/21/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/22/2020. (HEG)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against GEICO General Insurance Company, filed by Robert Ekstedt. (HEG)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Lewis and Clark County Case Register Report. All original state court documents retained on open civil shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (HEG)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to state court Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Mickelson, Marshal)
December 17, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2416094 (HEG)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Company from Montana First Judicial District Court L & C County, case number BDV-2019-1508., filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekstedt v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Represented By: Robert M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ekstedt
Represented By: Richard J. Pyfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?