Eggar v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ethelyn M Eggar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 6:2020cv00004
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Johnston. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (HEG)
February 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge John Johnston added. Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. (JEH)
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (HEG)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David Burdett on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Burdett, David)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel J. Benedict Garcia, Narissa C. Webber, Victoria L. Francis. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/3/2020. Sent via mail to plaintiff 1/15/2020. (JEH)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-03208. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JEH, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE. Defendant's Motion To Dismiss [#11 ], filed December 20, 2019, is granted to the extent it requests a transfer of venue. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Montana, Paul G. Hatfield Federal Courthouse, 901 Front Street, Suite 2100, Helena, Montana 59626. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/14/2020. (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ethelyn M Eggar. (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/2019. IT IS ORDERED that on or before 1/17/2020, plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss [#11 ]. (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Webber, Narissa) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/18/2019. The Proposed Joint Case Management Plan forSocial Security Cases [#9 ], filed December 16, 2019, is stricken. (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN - Proposed Joint Case Management Plan by Plaintiff Ethelyn M Eggar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, ) Modified on 12/18/2019 to strike pursuant to #10 Minute Order (athom, ). [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 1/11/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX092788 (alave, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Ethelyn M Eggar. (Attachments: #1 Letter for Reconsideration, #2 Envelope)(alave, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggar v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethelyn M Eggar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Narissa C. Webber
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Narissa C. Webber
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: David Burdett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?