Demarie v. Michael et al
Petitioner: Darren C. Demarie
Respondent: Lynn Guyer and Reginald D. Michael
Case Number: 6:2020cv00048
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Amended Petition due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition Form, #2 Complaint Form) Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
July 16, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number MTX9-15244 (TAG)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Brief/Memorandum in Support (70 pgs.) re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darren C. Demarie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K(53 pgs.)) (TAG)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (12 pgs.) (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Darren C. Demarie. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demarie v. Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lynn Guyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reginald D. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darren C. Demarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?