Mills v. XYLEM et al
Plaintiff: Dean Mills
Defendant: XYLEM and XYLEM DEWATERING SOLUTIONS,
Case Number: 6:2020cv00064
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by XYLEM DEWATERING SOLUTIONS,, XYLEM. (Ranta, Katie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Dean Mills. (Hohenlohe, Philip)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Dean Mills. (Hohenlohe, Philip)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Dean Mills. (Hohenlohe, Philip)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/19/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/19/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/21/2020. (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XYLEM DEWATERING SOLUTIONS,, XYLEM. (Ranta, Katie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by XYLEM DEWATERING SOLUTIONS,, XYLEM. (Ranta, Katie)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dean Mills. (HEG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Lewis and Clark County Case Register Report and State Court Documents. (HEG)
August 18, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2529008 (HEG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from MT First Judicial District Court, L & C County, case number CDV-2020-1064., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Spinner Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. XYLEM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Mills
Represented By: Philip A. Hohenlohe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYLEM
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYLEM DEWATERING SOLUTIONS,
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?