Donald J. Trump for President et al v. Bullock et al
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Montana Republican State Central Committee and Donald J. Trump for President
Defendant: Corey Stapleton and Stephen Bullock
Intervenor Plaintiff: Scott Sales and Greg Hertz
Intervenor Defendant: DCCC, Montana Democratic Party and DSCC
Amicus Curiae: League of Women Voters of Montana
Case Number: 6:2020cv00066
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED: Member-Plaintiffs request for an injunction pending appeal (Doc. 77) is DENIED. re (77 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/30/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 114 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motions held on 9-22-2020 before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the clerk's office, or the court reporter. NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact court reporter JoAnn Jett Corson, 406-698-9965, joannjettcorson@gmail.com. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (JJC)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDERED: Plaintiffs requests for injunctive, declaratory, or any other form of relief are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment in both the lead case (CV 2066HDLC) and the member case (CV2067HDLC) shall be entered in the Defendants favor. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/30/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Stephen Bullock for proceedings held on 9/22/20 before Judge Christensen. Court reporter JoAnn Jett Corson. Type of transcript: 3-Day. Transcript due by 10/1/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying (107) Motion to Strike; granting (109) Motion to Supplement. This matter is now fully submitted, and no further motions or declarations shall be permitted. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/25/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (ASG)
September 25, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION to Supplement the Record on Standing Tyler R. Green appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Spenser Merwin) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 24, 2020 Filing 108 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #107 MOTION to Strike filed by Stephen Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION to Strike Raphael Graybill appearing for Defendant Stephen Bullock (Graybill, Raphael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: (38 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Intervenor Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Hertz) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Milanovich, Anita)
September 23, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee Regarding Oral Argument Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 22, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE by Stephen Bullock of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Joint Rules of Montana Legislature) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 103 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dana L. Christensen: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2020 re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, et al. Mr. Tyler Green (arguing), Mr. James Brown, and Mr. James Bopp (arguing) appearing on behalf of Plaintiffs. Ms. Anita Milanovich appearing and arguing on behalf of Intervenor-Plaintiffs. Mr. Raphael Graybill (arguing), Ms. Rylee Sommeres-Flanagan and Mr. Christopher Abbott appearing for Defendant Governor Bullock. Mr. Austin James appearing for Defendant Corey Stapleton. Ms. Abha Khanna (arguing) and Mr. Peter Meloy appearing on behalf of Intervenor-Defendants. Ms. Patricia Klanke (arguing) and Hayden Johnson appearing on behalf of Amicus. Argument is heard by the parties. Defendant Bullock to file joint rules regarding legislature. Court deems matter fully submitted. In recess. Hearing commenced at 1:00pm and concluded at 3:48pm. (Court Reporter JoAnn Corson.) (Law Clerk: R. Wavra), (Hearing held in Missoula, MT) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (ASG)
September 22, 2020 Filing 102 Notice of Correction: re (72 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 72 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss. The filing error relates to: Multiple Motion Types Not Selected. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party re (73 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add text to event description (HEG).
September 21, 2020 Filing 100 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Patrick D. Llewellyn regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 99 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Simone T. Leeper regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 98 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Hayden S. Johnson regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 97 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Johnathan Diaz regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDERED: The motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 8689) are GRANTED on the condition that they do their own work. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Diaz, Mr. Llewellyn, Ms. Leeper, and Mr. Johnson file a separate pleading acknowledging their admission under the terms set forth above within fifteen (15)days of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDERED: Member-Plaintiffs (CV 2066HDLC) motion (Doc. 92) is GRANTED. Because Member-Plaintiffs (CV 2066HDLC) have already filed their overlength brief (Doc. 93) no further action on their part is necessary. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Diaz and Llewellyn are now registered e-filers and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 20, 2020 Filing 94 RESPONSE to Motion re (72 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sam Rubino) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ryan Dollar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Spenser Merwin) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief Tyler R. Green appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 18, 2020 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION For Preliminary injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Polio, Dennis) Modified on 9/21/2020 to create correct link to response #8 .
September 18, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION Hayden Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545462.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayden Johnson, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION Simone Leeper to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545456.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simone Leeper, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION Patrick Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545449.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Llewellyn, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION Jonathan Diaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545431.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Diaz, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDERED: Defendant Stephen Bullocks Unopposed Motion for Overlength Brief is GRANTED re (80 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 42 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Intervenor-Plaintiffs in the lead case (CV 20-66-H-DLC) shall have until on or before September 20, 2020 to file a response brief to Intervenor-Defendants Consolidated Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 72). No further briefing on this motion shall be permitted. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDERED: The Court clarifies its prior Order (Doc. 69) by specifying that local counsel need only attend the September 22, 2020 hearing personally if they intend to participate in oral argument. If local counsel does not intend to participate in oral argument, then they shall be permitted to attend remotely by following the instructions contained in this Courts prior Order. (Doc. 69 at 5.) re (70 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 36 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 18, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: (71 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Amicus Brief (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Celina Stewart, #2 Affidavit Nancy Leifer) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Klanke, Patricia)
September 17, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corey Stapleton. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (James, Austin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 81 Response to Motion re (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephen Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affadavit of Audrey McCue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to McCue Affadavit, #3 Affidavit Affadavit Paula Jaconetty, #4 Affidavit Affidavit Kathleen Mumme, #5 Affidavit Affidavit Dr. Greg Holzman, #6 Affidavit Affidavit Justin Sakalis, #7 Affidavit Affadavit Raphael Graybill, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit Exhibit L, #20 Exhibit Exhibit M, #21 Exhibit Exhibit N, #22 Exhibit Exhibit O, #23 Exhibit Exhibit P, #24 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #25 Exhibit Exhibit R) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael) Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct event text (HEG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION File Overlength Brief Raphael Graybill appearing for Defendant Stephen Bullock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to (38 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Intervenor Complaint by Stephen Bullock. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to (1 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Complaint, by Stephen Bullock. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re (39 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC, 76 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Objection by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 76 Response to Motion re: (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha) Modified on 9/18/2020 to correct docket text as incorrect event was selected. (HEG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT in Support re (74 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 37 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Abha Khanna appearing for Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 73 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #72 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss filed by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party. (Khanna, Abha) Modified on 9/22/2020 to create link to both motions. (HEG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss Abha Khanna appearing for Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party (Khanna, Abha). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 9/22/2020 (HEG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 71 Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by League of Women Voters of Montana. (Klanke, Patricia)
September 17, 2020 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION to Clarify Doc. 69 Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDERED: Plaintiffs motion for consolidation (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on the Plaintiffs respective motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Docs. 2; 8) is CONSOLIDATED with a trial on the merits. The parties shall be prepared at the September 22, 2020 hearing to present their case for and against the issuance of the permanent injunctive relief sought by Plaintiffs in both the lead (CV 2066HDLC) and member (CV2067HDLC) cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that time for oral argument at the September 22, 2020 hearing (Doc. 35) shall be allocated as follows: (See order for complete details.) Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/16/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 16, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Coleson, Richard)
September 16, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Stuedemann, Angela)
September 16, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Bopp, James)
September 16, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Milbank, Courtney)
September 15, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Angela Stuedemann is now a registered e-filer and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 15, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Richard Coleson is now a registered e-filer and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 64 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel, Angela Studemann regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of letter and order emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED: The motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 51, 52, 53, 54) are GRANTED on the condition that they do their own work. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Bopp, Ms. Stuedemann, Ms. Milbank, and Mr. Coleson file a separate pleading acknowledging their admission under the terms set forth above within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/14/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDERED: LWVMTs motion (Doc. 59) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Local Rule 7.5, the LWVMT shall be permitted to participate in this case as amicus by filing an amicus brief on or before September 17, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any amicus brief filed by the LWVMT shall not exceed 4000 words. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/14/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Dennis Polio and Jason Torchinsky are now registered e-filers and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 60 Brief/Memorandum in Support re (24 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION to Intervene filed by League of Women Voters of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Disclosure Statement) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Intervene Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Interested Party League of Women Voters of Montana Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Norris, Cameron)
September 11, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Weir, Bryan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 11, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (McCarthy, Thomas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION Richard E. Coleson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772540015.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION Courtney Turner Milbank to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772540018.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION Angela Stuedemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772540001.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION James Bopp Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772539998.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 10, 2020 Filing 50 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Dennis Polio regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of order and letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Filing 49 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Jason Torchinsky regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of order and letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED: Intervenor-Plaintiffs motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 43, 44) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 7, 8, 9, 10) in the member case (6:20-cv-00067-DLC) are DENIED subject to renewal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/10/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Emily E. Jones Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #43 Unopposed MOTION Jason Torchinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2540033.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Torchinsky Court Admissions) (Milanovich, Anita)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Case Nos. 6:20-cv-00066-DLC and 6:20-cv-00067-DLC are CONSOLIDATED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). Pursuant to the Guide for Filing in the District of Montana regarding consolidated cases, all documents shall be e-filed in the lead case 6:20-cv-00066-DLC and spread to the appropriate member case 6:20-cv-00067-DLC. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS AND INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION Dennis Polio to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2540040.) Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Intervenor Plaintiffs Greg Hertz, Scott Sales (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dennis Polio, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Milanovich, Anita)
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION Jason Torchinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2540033.) Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Intervenor Plaintiffs Greg Hertz, Scott Sales (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason Torchinsky, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Milanovich, Anita)
September 9, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Montana Democratic Party. (Meloy, Peter)
September 9, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. James on behalf of Corey Stapleton (James, Austin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice: re #38 Intervenor Complaint, #25 Summons Issued, #37 Letter, #23 Letter, #26 Notice of Appearance, #18 Response to Motion, #30 Response to Motion, #22 Letter, #31 Disclosure Statement, #33 MOTION to Intervene, #24 Reply to Response to Motion, #35 Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,, #19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, #21 Letter, #32 MOTION Abha Khanna to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2538551.), #34 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #17 Notice of Appearance, #28 MOTION to Intervene, #29 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #39 Response to Motion, #27 Notice of Appearance, #20 Letter, #36 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. Name of attorney whose NEF was undeliverable: Cameron T. Norris. (MRC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Greg Hertz, Scott Sales. (Milanovich, Anita)
September 8, 2020 Filing 38 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Scott Sales, Greg Hertz. (Milanovich, Anita)
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Abha Khanna regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of Order and letter emailed to PHV counsel. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Abha Khanna to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Ms. Khanna files a separate pleading acknowledging her admission under the terms set forth above within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/8/2020. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Intervene; granting #33 Motion to Intervene; denying #16 Motion to Expedite. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. 8) at 1:00 P.M. on September 22, 2020, at the Russel Smith Courthouse in Missoula, Montana. The Court will set time limits for oral arguments after all the briefs have been filed. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE FILING INFORMATION AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/8/2020. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Greg Hertz, Scott Sales. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint) (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene. Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Interested Parties Greg Hertz, Scott Sales (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Set Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 01:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Set Deadlines: Defendant and Intervenor-Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. 1) and the Intervenor-Plaintiffs Complaint on or before September 17, 2020. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Abha Khanna is now a registered e-filer and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. (HEG)
September 5, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION Abha Khanna to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2538551.) Peter M. Meloy appearing for Interested Party Montana Democratic Party (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Meloy, Peter)
September 5, 2020 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement by Montana Democratic Party. (Meloy, Peter)
September 4, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION to Intervene filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Brown, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Intervene filed by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer to Complaint) (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Intervene. Expedited Briefing Schedule Requested. Peter M. Meloy appearing for Interested Parties DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Abbott on behalf of Stephen Bullock (Abbott, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan on behalf of Stephen Bullock (Sommers-Flanagan, Rylee)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Stephen Bullock, Corey Stapleton. Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiffs' Counsel for service. (Attachments: Bullock Summons, #1 Stapleton Summons) (NOS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (McCarthy, Thomas)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV Counsel Cameron Norris regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of Letter and Order emailed to counsel. (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Bryan Weir regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of Letter and Order emailed to counsel. (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV Counsel Tyler Green regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of letter and Order emailed to counsel. (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Thomas R. McCarthy regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy with Order e-mailed to counsel. (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED: Plaintiffs motions to admit Mr. McCarthy, Mr. Green, Mr. Weir, and Mr. Norris pro hac vice (Docs. 1114) are GRANTED on the condition that they do their own work. See order for complete details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. McCarthy, Mr. Green, Mr. Weir, and Mr. Norris file a separate pleading acknowledging their admission under the terms set forth above within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/4/2020. (HEG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephen Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Raphael Graybill on behalf of Stephen Bullock (Graybill, Raphael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Brown, James)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Stephen Bullock, Corey Stapleton, re #1 Complaint, (Brown, James)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 Amended MOTION Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536589.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cameron T. Norris) (Brown, James)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 Amended MOTION Bryan Weir to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536584.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan Weir) (Brown, James)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 Amended MOTION Tyler Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536582.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tyler Green) (Brown, James)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Amended MOTION Thomas R. McCarthy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536580.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas R. McCarthy) (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Election Directive, #2 Exhibit 2 - Absentee Ballot Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Secretary's Mail-Ballot Instructions, #4 Exhibit 4 - March 15 Directive, #5 Exhibit 5 - March 26 Directive, #6 Exhibit 6 - April 22 Release, #7 Exhibit 7 - April 22 Directive, #8 Exhibit 8 - May 8 Directive, #9 Exhibit 9 - May 19 Directive, #10 Exhibit 10 - Phase Two Outline, #11 Exhibit 11 - Marc Elias Tweet, #12 Exhibit 12 - Carter-Baker Report, #13 Exhibit 13 - Morley Redlines Article, #14 Exhibit 14 - Washington State Article, #15 Exhibit 15 - NJ EO-105, #16 Exhibit 16 - NJ Balloting Article, #17 Exhibit 17 - Paterson Article #1, #18 Exhibit 18 - Paterson Article #2, #19 Exhibit 19 - Paterson Article #3, #20 Exhibit 20 - Paterson Article #4, #21 Exhibit 21 - NJ EO-144, #22 Exhibit 22 - NJ 2016 Turnout Data, #23 Exhibit 23 - NJ 2020 Turnout Data, #24 Exhibit 24 - NJ Delay Article, #25 Exhibit 25 - Nevada Balloting Article #1, #26 Exhibit 26 - Nevada Balloting Article #2, #27 Exhibit 27 - March 25 Release, #28 Exhibit 28 - 2020 Primary Election Data, #29 Exhibit 29 - Missoula Article, #30 Exhibit 30 - Gallatin Article, #31 Exhibit 31 - Lewis & Clark Article, #32 Exhibit 32 - Yellowstone Article, #33 Exhibit 33 - EO 10-2019, #34 Exhibit 34 - Dr. Fauci Article, #35 Exhibit 35 - Secretary's Inactives Email, #36 Exhibit 36 - Brennan Center Report, #37 Exhibit 37 - Wisconsin Article, #38 Exhibit 38 - CDC Study) (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: Plaintiffs motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 25) are DENIED subject to renewal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/2/2020. (HEG)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536589.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cameron T. Norris) (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Bryan Weir to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536584.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan Weir) (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Tyler Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536582.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tyler Green) (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Thomas R. McCarthy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2536580.) James Edward Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas R. McCarthy) (Brown, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Republican National Committee, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Republican National Committee, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
September 2, 2020 Filing fee RECEIVED: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2536357. (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J. Trump for President et al v. Bullock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Bryan Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Bryan Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Republican State Central Committee
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Bryan Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Tyler R. Green
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Bryan Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Stapleton
Represented By: Austin M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bullock
Represented By: Raphael Graybill
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Represented By: Christopher D. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Scott Sales
Represented By: Dennis W. Polio
Represented By: Jason Torchinsky
Represented By: Anita Y. Milanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Greg Hertz
Represented By: Dennis W. Polio
Represented By: Jason Torchinsky
Represented By: Anita Y. Milanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DCCC
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Montana Democratic Party
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSCC
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: League of Women Voters of Montana
Represented By: Hayden S. Johnson
Represented By: Patrick D. Llewellyn
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Michael Alan Kauffman
Represented By: Patricia Hope Klanke
Represented By: Simone T. Leeper
Represented By: Curt Glen Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?