Carter v. McKinnon et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Carter
Defendant: Jeffery McNabb, Bryceson McKinnon and Jacob Davison
Case Number: 6:2021cv00049
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re Address by Clayton Carter. Docket sheet to Carter. (TAG)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clayton Carter (TAG)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Carter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/24/2021. Mailed to MSP; Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/24/2021. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Account Statement by Clayton Carter (TAG)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner (Attachments: #1 Letter re Account Statement, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Notice re E-filing) Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Clayton Carter. (TAG) Modified on 6/25/2021: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clayton Carter. Motions referred to John Johnston. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. McKinnon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryceson McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?