Sliwinski v. Gootkin et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Emil Sliwinski
Defendant: Brian Gootkin, Paul Rees, Lt. Biltoft, Connie Winner, Levi Shrig, Tanya Dempsty, John Does 1-2 and Jane Does 1-2
Case Number: 6:2021cv00051
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report to Court filed by Thomas Emil Sliwinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 WITHDRAWAL of #13 Motion for Subpoena. (TAG)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Subpoena; dismissing as moot #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defense counsel will ensure Plaintiff is permitted to view the medical file at his facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/7/2021. Mailed to Sliwinski (TAG)
September 3, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Report to Court by Tanya Dempsty, Jane Does 1-2, John Does 1-2, Brian Gootkin, Lt. Biltoft, Paul Rees, Levi Shrig, Connie Winner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul Rees, #2 Exhibit 1) (Ambrose, Colleen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report to Court Colleen E. Ambrose appearing for Defendants Tanya Dempsty, Jane Does 1-2, John Does 1-2, Brian Gootkin, Lt. Biltoft, Paul Rees, Levi Shrig, Connie Winner Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ambrose, Colleen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen E. Ambrose on behalf of All Defendants (Ambrose, Colleen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Subpoena by Plaintiff Thomas Emil Sliwinski. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena) (TAG)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Sliwinski. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/19/2021. Mailed to Sliwinski (TAG) Modified on 8/19/2021: mailed to RSNU (TAG).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUESTING REPORT. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, counsel for Defendants may file a report summarizing Sliwinski's current medical condition and prognosis. If counsel chooses not to file a report, the Court will withdraw the request for waiver of service of summons and direct the United States Marshals Service promptly to effect personal service of summons on each Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/19/2021. Mailed to Sliwinski; electronically forwarded to legal counsel for DOC. (TAG)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s). Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order; if executed, an answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order. Waiver of Service due by 9/20/2021. Notice of Appearance due by 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/19/2021. Mailed to Sliwinski; documents forwarded to legal counsel for DOC as directed. (TAG)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas Emil Sliwinski. (TAG)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Objection re #6 Order (TAG)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas Emil Sliwinski. (TAG)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Response due by 8/4/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/22/2021. Mailed to Sliwinski (TAG)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Sliwinski with docket sheet (TAG)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Order re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Emil Sliwinski. (TAG). Modified on 7/21/2021 to correct document description (TAG).
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Thomas Emil Sliwinski. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (TAG)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Thomas Emil Sliwinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG) Modified on 8/19/2021: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Emil Sliwinski. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sliwinski v. Gootkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Emil Sliwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gootkin
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rees
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Biltoft
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Winner
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Shrig
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Dempsty
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-2
Represented By: Colleen E. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?