Brown et al v. Jacobsen
Plaintiff: Bob Brown, Hailey Sinoff and Donald Seifert
Defendant: Christi Jacobsen
Case Number: 6:2021cv00092
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
2 Judge: Paul J Watford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Jones on behalf of Christi Jacobsen (Jones, Emily)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the joint stipulated motion to incorporate arguments made in prior briefing, (Doc. #15 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jacobsen's motion to dismiss, (Doc. #13 ), is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/18/2022. (NOS)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay Proceedings filed by Bob Brown, Donald Seifert, Hailey Sinoff. (Van Kley, Constance)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Response to Motion to Dismiss: 1/13/2022. Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss: 1/14/2022. Discovery due by 2/2/2022. Motions due by 2/7/2022. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2022. Bench Trial set for 3/4/2022 at 9:00 a.m. at the Russell Smith Courthouse in Missoula, Montana. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/13/2022. (NOS)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Jacobsen is preliminarily enjoined from certifying candidates for Commissioner in District 1 and 5, pending a final disposition on the merits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the temporary restraining order, (Doc. #7 ), is MOOTED in light of the preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy, Circuit Judge Paul J. Watford, and Chief Judge Brian M. Morris on 1/13/2022. (NOS)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Bench Trial set for 3/4/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in the Russell Smith Courthouse in Missoula, MT, before Chief Judge Brian M. Morris. (NOS)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 3/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Paul J. Watford. (JEH)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Stipulated Motion to Incorporate Prior Briefing Brent Adam Mead appearing for Defendant Christi Jacobsen (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mead, Brent)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay Proceedings filed by Christi Jacobsen. (Mead, Brent)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively to Stay Proceedings Brent Adam Mead appearing for Defendant Christi Jacobsen (Mead, Brent)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendants's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Christi Jacobsen. (Mead, Brent)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the temporary restraining order as stated in the previous Order, (Doc. #7 ), shall remain in effect until January 18, 2022, or until an order on the preliminary injunction is entered, whichever happens first. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/7/2022. (NOS)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Donald W. Molloy, Judge Paul J. Watford (appearing via Zoom), and Chief Judge Brian Morris (appearing via Zoom): Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2022 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel Constance Van Kley, Rylee Sommers-Flanagan, and Joel Krautter appearing on behalf of plaintiffs. Counsel Brent Mead appearing on behalf of defendant. Counsel Van Kley and Mead provide argument, answer questions as asked by judge panel. Written order forthcoming. Hearing commenced at 9:07 a.m. and concluded at 10:07 a.m. (Court Reporter: Janet Davis (via Zoom)) (Law Clerk: T. Nickol) (Hearing held in Missoula, MT) (NOS)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bob Brown, Donald Seifert, Hailey Sinoff. (Van Kley, Constance) (NEF regenerated to Defendant following addition of counsel to the docket.) (NOS)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christi Jacobsen. (Mead, Brent)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy and Chief Judge Brian Morris. (NOS)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hailey Sinoff, Donald Seifert, Bob Brown: Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order or a preliminary injunction is GRANTED IN PART. It is granted insofar as Jacobsen is temporarily restrained as explained in this Order. The Court reserves ruling on the remainder of Plaintiffs' motion until the parties appear for a hearing. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Paul J. Watford, Judge Donald W. Molloy, and Chief Judge Brian M. Morris. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/22/2021. (dle)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bob Brown, Donald Seifert, Hailey Sinoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Montana State and County Population Totals, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from U.S. Census Bureau, Montana: 2010, #3 Exhibit Current PSC Map, #4 Exhibit Map Showing Deviation as of 2013, #5 Exhibit SB153 Proposed Map, #6 Exhibit Letter from Chairman Bill Gallagher to Sen. State Admin. Comm., #7 Exhibit Letter from Chairman Bill Gallagher to House Judiciary Comm., #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Bob Brown) (Van Kley, Constance) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/4/22 with flattened version.) (NOS)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Constance Van Kley appearing for Plaintiffs Bob Brown, Donald Seifert, Hailey Sinoff (Van Kley, Constance)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proof of Service filed by Bob Brown, Donald Seifert, Hailey Sinoff. Service by process server on December 10, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Van Kley, Constance)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER appointing Judge Paul J. Watford, U.S. Circuit Judge for the Ninth Circuit, and Chief Judge Brian M. Morris pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284(a). Signed by Chief Judge Mary H. Murguia, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (NOS)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christi Jacobsen and Attorney General. Original summonses emailed to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General Summons) (HEG)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christi Jacobsen, filed by Bob Brown, Hailey Sinoff, Donald Seifert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2776867 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Brown
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Joel Grant Krautter
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Sinoff
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Joel Grant Krautter
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Seifert
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Joel Grant Krautter
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Jacobsen
Represented By: Brent Adam Mead
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?