Arvidson v. Captain Bragg et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Arvidson
Defendant: Captain Bragg and Leo Dutton
Case Number: 6:2022cv00065
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: 1. The Clerk shall remove the word "LODGED" from the docket entry forthe Complaint. The Complaint is deemed filed July 25, 2022. 2. Within 21 days of this Order, Arvidson may file an amended complaint on the form to be provided by the Clerk of Court's Office. 3. The Clerk of Court shall provide Arvidson a form for filing an amended complaint. Copy of order w/amended complaint form mailed to Arvidson. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/14/2022. (HEG)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Arvidson Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/12/2022. Mailed to Arvidson and LCCD (TAG)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/12/2022. Mailed to Arvidson (TAG)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 Brief/Response to Order re #4 Order Setting filed by Bryan Arvidson. (TAG)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 Brief/Response to #4 Order filed by Bryan Arvidson. (TAG)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Response due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/3/2022. Mailed to Arvidson (TAG)
July 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Arvidson with docket (TAG)
July 25, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Bryan Arvidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (TAG) Modified on 9/14/2022 Remove "Lodged" text as complaint deemed filed on 7/25/22 (HEG).
July 25, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bryan Arvidson (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arvidson v. Captain Bragg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Arvidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?