Wagner v. American Chemet Corporation
Plaintiff: Levi Wagner
Defendant: American Chemet Corporation
Case Number: 6:2023cv00008
Filed: January 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 38 U.S.C. ยง 2022 Veterans' Re-employment Rights Act of 1988
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Chemet Corporation. (Oliveira, Christopher)
March 23, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Wagner's #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by American Chemet Corporation. (Oliveira, Christopher)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is GRANTED. The preliminary pretrial conference set for April 18, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and rescheduled for April 27, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. All other requirements set forth in the Court's order of March 2023, remain in effect. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/15/2023. (HEG)
March 14, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pre-trial Conference Nicholas A. LeTang appearing for Plaintiff Levi Wagner (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Continue, #2 Proposed Order on Motion to Continue) (LeTang, Nicholas)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/6/2023 and Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/6/2023. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Lead counsel for each party is to attend in person. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/6/2023. (HEG)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 American Chemet's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Filed by American Chemet Corporation. (Oliveira, Christopher)
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Chemet Corporation. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (HEG)
February 8, 2023 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Levi Wagner, re #1 Complaint (LeTang, Nicholas)
January 30, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number MTX9-17563 (TAG)
January 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Chemet Corporation, filed by Levi Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. American Chemet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Wagner
Represented By: Nicholas A. LeTang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Chemet Corporation
Represented By: Christopher K. Oliveira
Represented By: Kelsey Sabol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?