Krug v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Grace Krug
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2024cv00019
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 01:00 PM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Jury Trial set for 6/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2024. Discovery due by 1/15/2025. Motions due by 3/21/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/17/2024. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. (MMS)
April 17, 2024 ***Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on April 17, 2024. (SLL)
April 15, 2024 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Grace Krug. (Miller, Brian)
April 15, 2024 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Grace Krug. (Miller, Brian)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Grace Krug. (Miller, Brian)
April 15, 2024 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT Order Re-Setting Time of Preliminary Pretrial Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephonic Pretrial Conference is reset for 4/17/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/15/2024. (SLL)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/15/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/15/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/15/2024. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2024 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/6/2024. (TLO)
March 6, 2024 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston. (SAJ)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
February 27, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (TLO)
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Grace Krug. (TLO)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED ( from Montana First Judicial District Court, Lewis and Clark County, case number BDV-25-2023-0000794-BF.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order for Stipulated Deadlines, #4 Notice of Filing) (TLO)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/8/2024. (TLO)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Montana First Judicial District Court, Lewis and Clark County, case number DV-25-2023-0000794-BF., filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Verdicts, #3 Exhibit C - Cavin Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)
February 23, 2024 Filing fee: $405, receipt number AMTDC-3216345 (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krug v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Krug
Represented By: Brian J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Eric M. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?