Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Weldon et al

Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: Leslie Weldon and United States Forest Service
Intervenor: Bill Myers
Case Number: 9:2011cv00076
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Charles C. Lovell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 9/13/2016. (MKB)
May 15, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 5/15/2013. (MKB)
March 26, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 80 Motion to Strike; granting 91 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice, Clerk to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 3/26/2013. (MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Weldon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Weldon
Represented By: Alison D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Alison D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bill Myers
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: Rachel Ann Kinkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?