Walden et al v. Maryland Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Breanne Walden, Danielle Deschenes Azure, Jessica Blackweasel, Sabrina Remus Coyne, Brittany Dean, Jennifer Dement, Danielle Duncan, Jackie Greavu, Beth Hayes, Jana Heilig, Keallie Lietz, Jackie Mullennax, Sara Onsager, Anna Radford, Barbara Sloan, Molly Stilson, Kyra Tilson and DB&D, LLC
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company and Does 1 - 5
Case Number: 9:2013cv00222
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/19/2019. (ASG)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: the Defendant shall file its will-call witness and will-offer exhibit lists before the Final Pretrial Conference. Failure to do so may result in the Defendant's inability to call witnesses or offer exhibits at trial. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/16/2019. (ASG)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motions in Limine. This ruling is subject to reconsideration at trial. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/10/2018. (ASG)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying 155 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/30/2018. (ASG)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 162 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/9/2018. (ASG)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying 126 Motion to Strike as moot. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/4/2018. (NOS)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and reserving ruling in part re 88 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/4/2017. (ASG)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Count I for Brittany (Dean) Houston and Anna Radford filed by Maryland Casualty Company Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/29/2017. (KJH)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Compel; granting 32 Motion in Limine; granting 39 Motion for Protective Order; granting 58 Motion in Limine; granting 60 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/17/2015. (dle)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden et al v. Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanne Walden
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Deschenes Azure
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Blackweasel
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Remus Coyne
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Dean
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dement
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Duncan
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Greavu
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Hayes
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Heilig
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keallie Lietz
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Mullennax
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Onsager
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Radford
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sloan
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Stilson
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyra Tilson
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB&D, LLC
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?