Speaks v. Mazda Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Incarnacion L. Speaks
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2014cv00025
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/27/2018. (NOS)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER. This matter having been fully settled and the jury trial vacated, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to UNSEAL the case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/14/2018. (NOS)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER that for the trial beginning May 14, 2018, support staff for each party may bring into the courthouse one ( 1) cellular telephone and only those electronics (i.e. laptops) that are necessary for the presentation of evidence. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/11/2018. (APP)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER: the parties must file a notice as to their respective positions on bifurcation by 12:00 p.m. on May 11, 2018. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/10/2018. (ASG)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER: The parties shall submit an amended final pretrial order on or before May 2, 2018, that outlines the elements for liability in a defective design case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the amended final pretrial order STRIKE the second paragraph of Defendant's Statement (C). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a proposed verdict form on or before May 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/30/2018. (ASG)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties be prepared to discuss at the May 3, 2018, Final Pretrial Conference why any additional or different exhibits that were not admitted at the first trial be admitted. The parties should be further prepared to stipulate to the admissibility of those exhibits that were previously admitted at the first trial. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/16/2018. (NOS)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER denying 228 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report; denying 238 Motion in Limine. White Ms. Hoffman may testify at trial, her testimony is limited to the opinions disclosed in her initial report (dated November 2014). Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/14/2018. (NOS)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 218 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David P. Stone. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/14/2017. (NOS)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/19/2015. (dle)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Discovery - objecting to untimely expert witness disclosure supplementation; denying 76 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/16/2015. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speaks v. Mazda Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incarnacion L. Speaks
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?