Save Our Cabinets et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Plaintiff: Save Our Cabinets, Earthworks and Defenders of Wildlife
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 9:2015cv00069
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: SANDERS
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint stipulation (Doc. 90 ) is APPROVED and ADOPTED. 83 Motion for Attorney Fees terminated. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction over enforcement of the parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/21/2018. (NOS)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 83 Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing on Attorney Fees and Costs. Further proceedings on Plaintiffs' motion for an award of fees and costs, including the filing of memoranda and evidentiary and other materials supporting that motion, are stayed for an additional 30 days, until June 25, 2018. At that time, Plaintiffs and Federal Defendants shall provide notice of settlement or explain why further briefing is necessary. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/21/2018. (NOS)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/27/2018. (APP)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (NOS)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION and ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motions for summary judgment (Docs. 35, 44, 48) are granted in-part and denied in-part. Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. 35) is GRANTED as to Counts I, III, IV, V, and VI. The defendants' cross-motions (Docs. 44, 48) are GRANTED as to Count II. This matter is REMANDED to the agencies for further review consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/30/2017. (NOS)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Tuchman for Montanore Minerals Corporation. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/9/2016. (NOS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save Our Cabinets et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save Our Cabinets
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Timothy J. Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earthworks
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Timothy J. Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Timothy J. Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?