King v. Recreational Equipment, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kelly King
Defendant: Recreational Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2016cv00027
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/12/2017. (ASG)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion in Limine. See Order for witnesses' deadline of 12/9/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/8/2016. (dle)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion in Limine. The Court finds that arguments on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine 21 would be beneficial and will address this at the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/7/2016. (dle)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/6/2016. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Recreational Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly King
Represented By: Paul M. Leisher
Represented By: David R. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recreational Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. Gerdrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?