Knutson et al v. Curry et al
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Lenka Knutson and Knutson
Defendant: Chuck Curry, Curry and Tim Fox
Case Number: 9:2016cv00062
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/21/2017. (ASG)
July 6, 2017 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Rhoades, Quentin)
May 23, 2017 Filing 49 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Donald W. Molloy: Status Conference held on 5/23/2017. Counsel Quentin Rhoades and David Sigale (via video conference) appearing on behalf of Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Counsel Caitlin Overland appearing on behalf of Defendant Chuck Curry. Counsel Stuart Segrest appearing on behalf of Defendant Tim Fox. Parties heard on the status of the case and the availability of attorney's fees. Hearing commenced at 9:04 a.m. and concluded at 9:22 a.m. (Court Reporter JoAnn Bacheller.) (Law Clerk: N. VandenBos), (Hearing held in Missoula) (NOS)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Sigale may appear via videoconferencing at the status hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to continue is denied. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/18/2017. (NOS)
May 16, 2017 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at May 23, 2017 Status Conference (Amended) David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sigale, David)
May 16, 2017 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at May 23, 2017 Status Conference David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Sigale, David) (Modified on 5/17/2017 to terminate motion; amended motion filed as Doc. #47 on 5/16/17) (NOS).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Setting: Status Conference set for 5/23/2017 at 9:00 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/15/2017. (dle)
May 8, 2017 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Sigale, David)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re #39 MOTION to Stay filed by Chuck Curry, Tim Fox. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants are enjoined from enforcing the citizenship requirement of Mont. Code Ann. 45-8-321(1) against Plaintiff Lenka Knutson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial in this matter set for February 13, 2017, is STAYED pending action in the 2017 Montana legislative session on House Bill 273. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide a status report within 30 days of the resolution, by passage, death, or otherwise in the 2017 legislative session, of House Bill 273, and in any event no later than 30 days after the end of the legislative session. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining dates in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 30), including the trial date, are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/25/2017. (NOS)
January 24, 2017 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Stay filed by Chuck Curry, Tim Fox. (Segrest, J.)
January 23, 2017 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION to Stay filed by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sigale, David)
January 23, 2017 Filing 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #39 MOTION to Stay filed by Chuck Curry, Tim Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HB 273) (Segrest, J.)
January 23, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay J. Stuart Segrest appearing for Defendants Chuck Curry, Tim Fox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Segrest, J.)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Lenka Knutson. IT IS ORDERED that argument on the motion shall be consolidated with the bench trial in this matter scheduled for February 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/19/2017. (NOS)
January 18, 2017 Filing 37 STATEMENT re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #36 Response to Motion (Statement of No-Reply) by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Sigale, David)
December 27, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chuck Curry, Tim Fox. (Segrest, J.)
December 21, 2016 Filing 35 Addendum to #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Sigale, David) (Modified to amend docket text) (NOS).
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Lenka Knutson. Plaintiffs shall file an addendum indicating whether the defendants have been contacted regarding the motion for preliminary injunction and whether the defendants oppose the motion. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/20/2016. (ASG)
December 20, 2016 Filing 33 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lenka Knutson, #2 Exhibit Knutson - DL and Perm. Res. Card, #3 Exhibit Knutson - CWP Application and Approval, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Julianne H. Versnel, #5 Exhibit Order of Injunction in Veasey v. Wilkins (E.D.N.C.), #6 Exhibit Order of Injunction in Pot v. Witt (W.D.AR), #7 Exhibit Order of Injunction in Nino de Rivera Lajous v. Sankey (D.NE), #8 Exhibit Order of Injunction in Jackson v. Eden (D.N.M.)) (Sigale, David)
December 19, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Sigale, David)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Order/Judgment, subject to renewal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/9/2016. (APP, )
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/13/2017 at 9:00 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2017 at 9:00 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2016. Discovery due by 12/12/2016. Motions due by 1/9/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2017. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/3/2016. (DLE)
November 3, 2016 Filing 29 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Donald W. Molloy: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/3/2016 on the record in the courtroom. Counsel Quentin Rhoades and David Sigale present on behalf of Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Counsel Caitlin Overland present on behalf of Defendant Chuck Curry. Counsel J. Stuart Segrest present on behalf of Defendant Tim Fox. Parties clarify positions. Scheduling dates reviewed and set. Counsel Sigale will be allowed to proceed to bench trial without presence of local counsel, if necessary. Written scheduling order to follow. (Court Reporter JoAnn Bacheller.) (Law Clerk: N. VandenBos), (Hearing held in Missoula) (NOS, )
October 27, 2016 Filing 28 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Sigale, David)
October 27, 2016 Filing 27 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Rhoades, Quentin)
October 27, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David William Randall on behalf of Chuck Curry (Randall, David)
October 27, 2016 Filing 25 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Chuck Curry. (Overland, Caitlin)
October 27, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Stuart Segrest on behalf of Tim Fox (Segrest, J.)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #21 Motion to Stay; denying #22 Motion to Vacate. The preliminary pretrial conference will proceed as scheduled, and will be conducted on the record. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/27/2016. (DLE)
October 26, 2016 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Vacate #16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Litigation Deadlines Quentin M. Rhoades appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rhoades, Quentin)
October 26, 2016 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Joint MOTION to Stay David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order (for Preliminary Injunction and Stay)) (Sigale, David)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Honorable Tim Fox, Attorney General for the State of Montana, is JOINED as a defendant in this matter. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/6/2016. (NOS, )
October 6, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer deadline. (NOS, )
October 6, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE by Lenka Knutson re #18 Notice (Other), Certificate of Service (Rhoades, Quentin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE by Lenka Knutson re #16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, of Service on Montana Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Office of Attorney General, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email from Office of Attorney General) (Rhoades, Quentin)
September 30, 2016 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to TIM FOX, ATTORNEY GENERAL. (APP, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/27/2016. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/27/2016. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/27/2016. Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/3/2016 at 10:30 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Motions terminated: #15 Joint MOTION to Vacate #13 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Deadlines filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Lenka Knutson. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/30/2016. (DLE)
September 27, 2016 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Vacate #13 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Deadlines Quentin M. Rhoades appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rhoades, Quentin)
August 22, 2016 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Order/Judgment and Permanent Injunction David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to Entrty of Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Sigale, David)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/28/2016. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/28/2016. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/28/2016. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 10:30 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/4/2016. (DLE)
August 1, 2016 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chuck Curry. (Overland, Caitlin)
July 26, 2016 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION. (Copy sent certified mail to T. Fox). (NOS, ) Modified on 8/2/2016; certified mail return receipt received in clerk's office; certified mail signed for on 7/28/2016. (NOS, ).
July 26, 2016 Terminate deadlines: Show Cause Response Deadline (per Doc. 9) terminated. (NOS, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Chuck Curry waiver sent on 6/2/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (Sigale, David)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting: Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2016. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/19/2016. (DLE)
June 23, 2016 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Sigale, David)
June 23, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Sigale on behalf of Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Sigale, David)
April 30, 2016 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Amendment to #3 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Amended Declaration of David G. Sigale). (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Admitted Jurisdictions, #2 Exhibit Certification of David G. Sigale, #3 Exhibit Letter to State Bar of Montana) (Sigale, David)
April 30, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Lenka Knutson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re #3 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Court 4/20/16) (Sigale, David)
April 20, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chuck Curry. (Original to plaintiff's counsel). (NOS, )
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David G. Sigale. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/20/2016. (NOS, )
April 20, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION David G. Sigale to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1765059.) Quentin M. Rhoades appearing for Plaintiff Lenka Knutson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Rhoades, Quentin)
April 18, 2016 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-1763711. (ASG, )
April 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Lenka Knutson and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knutson et al v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenka Knutson
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Curry
Represented By: Caitlin Overland
Represented By: David William Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fox
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?