Rustad-Link v. Providence Health and Services et al

Plaintiff: Dawn Rustad-Link
Defendant: Providence Health and Services and Unum Group Corporation
Case Number: 9:2016cv00136
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Dawn Rustad-Link against Providence Health and Services and Unum Group Corporation. (NOS)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED OPINION & ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Unum shall reimburse Rustad-Link for the benefits it withheld, and shall reinstate her present and future benefi ts without the offset. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a request for fees and costs, supported by affidavit and other documentation, within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link' s request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a reasoned request for an award of pre-judgment interest within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link's request. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/31/2018. (NOS)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Unum shall reimburse Rustad-Link for the benefits it withheld, and shall reinstate her present and future benefits without the off set. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a request for fees and costs, supported by affidavit and other documentation, within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link's request. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a reasoned request for an award of pre-judgment interest within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link's request. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/30/2018. (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rustad-Link v. Providence Health and Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Rustad-Link
Represented By: Michael J. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health and Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?