Wooten v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Zachary Wooten
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 9:2016cv00139
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting 344 Motion. A Supersedeas Bond in the amount of $3,500,000.00 is APPROVED and proceedings to enforce judgment are STAYED pending resolution of the appeal to the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/29/2019. (ASG)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 296 Motion for Amended Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 301 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 307 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/23/2019. (ASG)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 298 Motion to Stay. Execution of the November 7, 2018 Judgment 294 is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the Parties' post-trial motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a). BNSF's request for waiver of a supersedeas bond is DENIED SUBJECT TO RENEWAL at the appropriate time. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/13/2018. (ASG)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The total judgment entered against Defendant is $2,171,154.50. (ASG)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER: that meals and/or lodging be provided for the jurors in the above entitled case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/29/2018. (ASG)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER overruling 44 Objection. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/19/2018. (ASG)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations 200 in full. The Parties' cross-motions for partial summary judgment on Wooten's FRSA claim 99 and 105 are DENIED and BNSF's Motion for Summary Judgment on Wooten's LIA claim 102 isDENIED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/18/2018. (ASG)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER that the parties motions in limine to exclude or limit expert testimony and other evidence (docs. 151, 164, 166 & 168) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/1/2018. (APP)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 105 First MOTION for Summary Judgment, 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment. ORDER re 115 MOTION for Sanctions, 153 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order, 162 First MOTION for Protective Order, 181 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/29/2018. (APP)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/16/2018. (APP)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Bifurcate Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/17/2017. (TXB)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations and denying 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/21/2017. (APP)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/6/2017. (APP)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. Magnuson for Zachary Wooten. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/20/2016. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wooten v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Wooten
Represented By: William G. Jungbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?