Katica v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eileen M. Katica
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2016cv00150
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/5/2019. (ASG)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that the parties Stipulation is hereby approved and the Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for insurance bad faith is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear her and its own costs and attorney fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that from and after the date of this Order approving the parties Stipulation, counsel Jeff Tuttle shall be allowed to serve as trial counsel and shall be allowed to conduct and defend depositions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED finding as moot 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W. Anderson on 9/24/2018. (APP)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part, refusing in part and modified in part as to 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W. Anderson on 8/28/2018. (APP)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Jeffrey B. Tuttle is disqualified in this case from conducting depositions, making opening and closing arguments, and examining witnesses at trial. Tuttle is subject to being deposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W. Anderson on 7/19/2018. (APP)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel and deliver to Allstate signed releases within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W. Anderson on 3/13/2018. (APP)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Anderson. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/16/2017. (APP) Modified on 5/16/2017 to reflect correcting Magistrate Judge from Lynch to Anderson. Regenerated NEF (APP).
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey Tuttle for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/15/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katica v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen M. Katica
Represented By: Bryan C. Tipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?