Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. v. Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Defendant: Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc, Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs and Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2017cv00035
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/26/2018. (NOS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice) (Bender, Ronald)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Setting: Dismissal Papers due by 11/27/2018. The preliminary pretrial conference set for 11/15/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/23/2018. (dle)
October 23, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Settlement JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Bender, Ronald)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint All Defendants. Answer or other responsive pleading due on or before 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/28/2018. (dle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Randy J. Cox appearing for Defendants Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cox, Randy)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER LIFTING STAY,and PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/8/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/8/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/8/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/12/2018. (dle)
September 7, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Donald W. Molloy: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/7/2018. Counsel Ron Bender appearing on behalf of Plaintiff Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. Counsel Randy Cox appearing on behalf of Defendants Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc., Cameron Crebs, and Rick Crebs. Parties request the stay be lifted and the matter be set for preliminary conference following the October 10th arbitration. Court indicates that the stay will be lifted and the order setting conference will be forthcoming. Hearing commenced at 11:01 a.m. and concluded at 11:13 a.m. (Court Reporter JoAnn Bacheller.) (Law Clerk: S. Stephens), (Hearing held in Missoula) (NOS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 28 Brief/Response to Order re #25 Order Setting Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Bender, Ronald)
August 15, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew D White in Support of Response to OSC re Lifting Arbitration Stay) (White, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. of Filing JAMS Arbitration Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - JAMS Arbitration Report) (Cox, Randy)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Setting: Show Cause Response due by 8/15/2018. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 11:00 AM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/1/2018. (dle)
July 31, 2018 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT Joint by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Bender, Ronald)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 1, 2018, indicating the status of their ongoing arbitration. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/17/2018. (NOS)
January 31, 2018 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Joint by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Bender, Ronald)
January 31, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald A. Bender (Bender, Ronald)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Setting: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2018. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/8/2018. (dle)
September 18, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. of Initiation of Non-Binding Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bender, Ronald)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order, Aviation Alliance is directed to pay Polaris $4,770.00 as compensation for attorneys' fees incurred as a result of the motion to compel arbitration. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/21/2017. (ASG) Modified on 7/21/2017 (ASG).
July 13, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. re #16 Notice (Other), Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Statement of Attorney's Fees (Bender, Ronald)
June 30, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. of Submission of Documentation Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Randy J. Cox, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Andrew D. White) (Cox, Randy)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Compel. It is GRANTED as to Counts II, III, IV, V, and XI. Aviation Alliance's failure to initiate arbitration within ninety (90) days from today's date will result in the dismissal of its arbitrable claims with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that resolution of the remaining, nonarbitrable claims (Counts I, VI, VII, and VIII is STAYED pending arbitration of the arbitrable issues. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Polaris' request for costs, fees, and expenses is GRANTED as to half of those incurred in bringing the present motion. Polaris shall file documentation of its request within seven (7) days of today's date. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/27/2017. (NOS)
June 7, 2017 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #13 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Cameron Crebs) (Cox, Randy)
June 7, 2017 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.. (Cox, Randy)
May 24, 2017 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration DECLARATION OF RODGER J. REYNOLDS filed by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Bender, Ronald)
May 24, 2017 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Bender, Ronald)
May 10, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.. (Cox, Randy)
May 10, 2017 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12-01-09 MSA, #2 Exhibit 2 - 02-01-16 MSA) (Cox, Randy)
May 10, 2017 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.. (Cox, Randy)
May 10, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Randy J. Cox appearing for Defendants Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. (Cox, Randy)
May 10, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (White, Andrew)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew D. White. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/4/2017. (NOS)
May 3, 2017 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION Andrew D. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-1945768.) Randy J. Cox appearing for Defendants Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew D. White in Support of Mtn for Admission PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Admission of Andrew D. White) (Cox, Randy)
April 28, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Bender, Ronald)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. (Original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
March 20, 2017 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-1923104. (NOS)
March 20, 2017 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Cameron R. Crebs, Rick Crebs, Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc., filed by Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc. v. Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron R. Crebs
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Andrew D. White
Represented By: John M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Crebs
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Andrew D. White
Represented By: John M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Enterprise Group, Inc.
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Andrew D. White
Represented By: John M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviation Alliance Insurance Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Martin Rogers
Represented By: Ronald A. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?