Breck et al v. Stapleton
Case Number: 9:2017cv00036
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (NOS)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Judge Morris. Referral to Judge Lynch is terminated. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/18/2017. (APP)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/11/2017. (APP)
April 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 3 and enjoins the State from enforcing Montanas ballot access laws to the extent that it requires an independent or minor party candidate to obtain in excess of 400 valid signatures in order to appear on the ballot for the May 25, 2017, special election for the United States House of Representatives. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/8/2017. (SLL)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Present Testimony by Video Conference. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/3/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breck et al v. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?