Gersh v. Anglin Featured Case

Plaintiff Tanya Gersh alleged that Defendant Andrew Angling, publisher of the Daily Stormer, published a series of articles on his neo-Nazi website, which caused his followers to overwhelm plaintiff with "hundreds of hateful and threatening anti-Semitic phone calls, voicemails, text messages, emails, letters, social media comments, and false online business reviews." The complaint asserts claims for invasion of privacy, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and violations of Montana's Anti-Intimidation Act.

Plaintiff: Tanya Gersh
Defendant: Andrew Anglin
Case Number: 9:2017cv00050
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Answer Interrogatories and for Sanctions; Certificate of Good Faith Conferral filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Gregory Anglin depo excerpts) (Morrison, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 119 SUPPLEMENT re 24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Randazza, Marc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 118 Order that Mr. Randazza shall, on or before November 30, 2018, file in the record of this case an update to his pro hac vice application reporting any new information required by Rule 83.l(d)(S) of the Local Rules of Procedure for the District of Montana. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/19/2018. (APP)
November 14, 2018 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re 112 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Answer Interrogatories and for Sanctions; Certificate of Good Faith Conferral in Opposition filed by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Randazza, Marc)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Findings and Recommendations 85 in full. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/14/2018. (ASG)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/7/2018. (TXB)
November 7, 2018 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplement Authority David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Dinielli, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 113 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 112 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Answer Interrogatories and for Sanctions; Certificate of Good Faith Conferral filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant, # 2 Exhibit Emails re Discovery Request Extensions, # 3 Exhibit Defendant's Supp. Resp. to Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit Emails re Meet and Confer, # 5 Exhibit Operation Whitefish Article) (Dinielli, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 112 First MOTION to Compel Defendant to Answer Interrogatories and for Sanctions; Certificate of Good Faith Conferral David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Dinielli, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Randazza, Marc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 110 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Randazza, Marc) Modified on 10/17/2018 to correct relationship linking this to 109 Response and 85 F&R. Regenerated NEF (APP).
October 8, 2018 Filing 109 RESPONSE to NOTICE re 104 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Tanya Gersh. (Dinielli, David) Modified to link to F & R. (NOS)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting motion for to leave to respond and denying motion to strike 105 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/28/2018. (TXB)
September 24, 2018 Filing 107 RESPONSE to Motion re 105 MOTION to Strike 104 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND filed by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 106 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 105 MOTION to Strike 104 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND filed by Tanya Gersh. (Morrison, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION to Strike 104 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Morrison, John)
September 12, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc) (NOS).
July 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings:. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 2:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2019 at 9:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Note: Dates and times remain the same - judge designation changed. (dle)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 TEXT ORDER. Having considered the merits of the parties' respective arguments relating to Defendant's motion for protective order (doc.100), the motion is granted in part and denied in part as follows. Defendant shall provide complete responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories no later than August 10, 2018. Defendant shall provide complete responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for production no later than August 27, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/13/2018. (Lynch, Jeremiah)
July 12, 2018 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re 100 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Anglin's Objections and Responses to First Requests for Production, # 2 Exhibit B - Anglin's Objections to First Interrogatories) (Dinielli, David)
July 9, 2018 Filing 101 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 100 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Gersh First Interrogatories to Anglin, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Gersh First Requests for Production of Documents to Anglin, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Wolman Email to Gersh Counsel July 5 2018, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Wolman Declaration) (Wolman, Jay)
July 9, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION for Protective Order Jay M. Wolman appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Wolman, Jay)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin re 91 Objection to Findings and Recommendations Notice of Supplemental Authority (Randazza, Marc)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. filed by Tanya Gersh. (Dinielli, David)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. Responses due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/30/2018. (APP)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 91 Objection to Findings and Recommendations (UNOPPOSED) David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Dinielli, David)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re 87 MOTION to Clarify Status of Discovery Stay filed by Tanya Gersh. The discovery stay imposed pursuant to the Court's Order dated December 15, 2017, is hereby terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/24/2018. (APP)
May 23, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE by State of Montana (Cochenour, Matthew)
May 18, 2018 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re 87 MOTION to Clarify Status of Discovery Stay filed by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
May 18, 2018 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendations as to 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. Jay M. Wolman appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolman, Jay)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OBJECTION to 85 Findings and Recommendations filed by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 88 Attorney General's Motion to Intervene as a matter of right. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/17/2018. (NOS)
May 14, 2018 Filing 89 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 88 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Montana. (APP)
May 14, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to Intervene - Jonathan W. Bennion, Dale M. Schowengerdt, Matthew T. Cochenour appearing for Interested Party State of Montana. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (APP)
May 11, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION to Clarify Status of Discovery Stay David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Dinielli, David)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER adopting in full 75 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/7/2018. (NOS)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/3/2018. (APP)
May 2, 2018 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Andrew Anglin for proceedings held on 04/03/2018 before Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Court reporter Julie Lake. Transcript due by 5/7/2018. (Randazza, Marc)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss heairng re 75 Findings and Recommendations held on 4/3/18 before Judge Lynch. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the Clerks Office or the court reporter NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact Court Reporter Julie Lake, 406-543-6447. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (APP) (Modified on 4/26/2018 to correct court reporter phone number.) (NOS)
April 23, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc J. Randazza (Randazza, Marc)
April 19, 2018 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Tanya Gersh for proceedings held on April 3, 2018 before Judge Hon. Jeremiah C. Lynch. Court reporter Julie Lake. Transcript due by 4/24/2018. (Dinielli, David)
April 3, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin Notice of Constitutional Question (Wolman, Jay)
April 3, 2018 Filing 79 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch: Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2018 re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin; David Dinielli and John Morrison appeared on behalf of Plaintiff, Marc Randazza and Matt Stevenson appeared on behalf of Defendant; Written findings to follow; Hearing commenced at 1:35 p.m. and concluded at 2:53 p.m. (Court Reporter Julie Lake.) (Hearing held in Missoula) (APP)
March 26, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin (Stevenson, Mathew)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 76 Motion Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/22/2018. (TXB)
March 21, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION to Reset Hearing on Motion to Dismiss re 75 Findings and Recommendations,,,, Order Setting,,, Marc J. Randazza appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Randazza, Marc)
March 21, 2018 Set Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2018 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Anglins Motion to Dismiss be DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and for lack of personal jurisdiction based on insufficient service of process pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5). To the extent Anglin moves to the dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on Anglins motion is scheduled for April 3, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., at the Russell Smith Courthouse, 201 E. Broadway, in Missoula, Montana. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/21/2018. (APP) Modified on 3/22/2018 to reflect Julie Lake will be here (APP).
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Vacate. The Court will reset the motions deadline and other pretrial deadlines if necessary after ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/21/2018. (APP)
March 12, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Vacate Deadline for Amending Pleadings filed by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
March 9, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION to Vacate Deadline for Amending Pleadings David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Dinielli, David)
February 16, 2018 Filing 71 In Camera Document(s) re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3) (Randazza, Marc)
February 8, 2018 Filing 70 Brief/Response to Order re 66 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File, 64 Errata, 68 Brief/Response to Order,, filed by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript, Excerpted) (Randazza, Marc)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/7/2018. (TXB)
January 29, 2018 Filing 68 Brief/Response to Order re 66 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File, 64 Errata filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James M. Knoepp, # 2 Exhibit A - Moonbase Holdings Agent Address Change, # 3 Exhibit B - Huffington Post Article, # 4 Exhibit C - Damnak Villa Boutique, # 5 Exhibit D - Daily Stormer Article, # 6 Exhibit E - Greek Consulate General in Chicago, # 7 Exhibit F - Thai Tourist Visa, # 8 Exhibit G - Laotian Passport Stamps, # 9 Exhibit H - Laotian Visa) (Dinielli, David)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/25/2018. (APP)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 65 Motion to Strike ; granting 65 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/18/2018. (TXB)
January 18, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Strike 64 Errata , MOTION for Leave to File Response in the Alternative David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support) (Dinielli, David)
January 17, 2018 Filing 64 ERRATA 59 Reply to Response to Motion,, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Andrew Anglin) (Randazza, Marc)
January 16, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin re 60 Notice (Other), Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery (Randazza, Marc) Modified on 1/17/2018 to create relationship to 31 Motion (APP).
January 16, 2018 Filing 62 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Tanya Gersh. (Knoepp, James)
January 16, 2018 Filing 61 ERRATA 59 Reply to Response to Motion,, . (Randazza, Marc) Modified on 1/17/2018 to create relationship to 31 Motion (APP).
January 16, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE by Tanya Gersh re 59 Reply to Response to Motion, 50 Response to Motion,,, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery, or in the Alternative, Request for Leave to File Surreply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (transcript excerpts from preliminary pretrial conference)) (Knoepp, James)
January 12, 2018 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - DS Article, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Franklin BOE Subpoena Response, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Franklin BOE Subpoena Response, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Randazza Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Meijer Subpoena, # 6 Exhibit 6 - DVD (Conventionally Filed)) (Randazza, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2018: # 7 Certificate of Service regarding Exhibit 6) which was received and placed on shelf in clerk's office-Msla
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/9/2018. (TXB)
January 8, 2018 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Marc J. Randazza appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Randazza, Marc)
December 29, 2017 Filing 56 Electronica Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Mathew M. Stevenson, Marc J. Randazza, Jay M. Wolman, James M. Knoepp, John M. Morrison, David C. Dinielli, J. Richard Cohen, Robert Farris-Olsen, Morris Dees. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/16/2018. (APP)
December 28, 2017 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM for proceedings held on 12/14/17 before Judge Lynch - 45 PPTC. Court reporter JoAnn Bacheller. (APP)
December 26, 2017 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Tanya Gersh for proceedings held on 12/14/2017 before Judge Lynch. Court reporter JoAnn Bacheller. Transcript due by 1/9/2018. (Knoepp, James)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Replies due by 1/12/2018. Motions ripe 1/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/22/2017. (TCL)
December 22, 2017 Filing 52 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
December 22, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss Marc J. Randazza appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Randazza, Marc)
December 21, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Daily Stormer Article, # 2 Exhibit B - Accurint Reports, # 3 Exhibit C - Daily Stormer Article, # 4 Exhibit D - Registration Information, # 5 Exhibit E - Cincinnati.com Article, # 6 Exhibit F - Auditor Records, # 7 Exhibit G - Corporation Details, # 8 Exhibit H - Corporation Details, # 9 Exhibit I - Corporation Details, # 10 Exhibit J - Corporation Details, # 11 Exhibit K - Whois Report, # 12 Exhibit L - Daily Stormer Article, # 13 Exhibit M - Docket Report, # 14 Exhibit N - Daily Reporter, # 15 Exhibit O - Proof of Publication, # 16 Exhibit P - LA Times Article, # 17 Exhibit Q - Daily Stormer Article, # 18 Exhibit R - Daily Stormer Article, # 19 Exhibit S - Reveal Article, # 20 Exhibit T - Rule, # 21 Affidavit of Dinielli, # 22 Affidavit of Cremeans) (Dinielli, David)
December 21, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Tanya Gersh re 48 Letter, 47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Knoepp, James)
December 21, 2017 Filing 48 Letter from Clerk advising PHV to register. (copy mailed to attorney with order granting PHV for James Knoepp) (KJH)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/21/2017. (KJH)
December 20, 2017 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION James M. Knoepp to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2061960.) John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Knoepp, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Morrison, John)
December 19, 2017 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12-14-2017 before Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the clerk's office or the transcriber. NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact Court Reporter JoAnn Bacheller, 406-698-9965, JoAnnCBacheller@gmail.com. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the court reporter page of our website. Redaction Request due 1/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2018. (JCB)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/19/2017. (TCL)
December 19, 2017 Filing 43 Submission of Proposed Order re: 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . (Dinielli, David)
December 19, 2017 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Dinielli, David)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2018. Discovery due by 9/21/2018. Motions due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/15/2017. (TXB)
December 15, 2017 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Andrew Anglin for proceedings held on 12/14/2017 before Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch.. Transcript due by 12/22/2017. (Randazza, Marc) Modified on 12/18/2017 to reflect audio to J. Bachellar (APP).
December 14, 2017 Filing 39 MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch: Plaintiff's counsel David Dinielli and John Morrison appeared in person, Defense counsel Marc Randazza, Jay Wolman and David Moldenado appeared by phone. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/2017. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (Hearing held in Missoula) (KJH)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/11/2017. (TXB)
December 8, 2017 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference Marc J. Randazza appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Randazza, Marc)
December 7, 2017 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
December 7, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE by Tanya Gersh on Status of Statement of Stipulated Facts (Dinielli, David)
December 7, 2017 Filing 34 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix - Certificate of Service) (Dinielli, David)
December 7, 2017 Filing 33 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Tanya Gersh. (Dinielli, David)
November 30, 2017 Filing 32 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Anglin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Does Love Really Live Here, # 2 Exhibit 2 - DS Article - Dec 16 2016, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Gersh Communications, # 4 Exhibit 4 - DS Article Dec 17 2016, # 5 Exhibit 5 - DS Article Dec 19 2016, # 6 Exhibit 6 - DS Article Dec 21 2016, # 7 Exhibit 7 - DS Article Dec 21 2016, # 8 Exhibit 8 - DS Article Dec 22 2016, # 9 Exhibit 9 - DS Article Dec 23 2016, # 10 Exhibit 10 - DS Article Dec 23 2016, # 11 Exhibit 11 - DS Article Dec 23 2016, # 12 Exhibit 12 - DS Article Dec 27 2016, # 13 Exhibit 13 - DS Article Dec 28 2016, # 14 Exhibit 14 - DS Article Jan 05 2017, # 15 Exhibit 15 - DS Article Jan 06 2017, # 16 Exhibit 16 - DS Article Jan 08 2017, # 17 Exhibit 17 - DS Article Jan 08 2017, # 18 Exhibit 18 - DS Article Jan 10 2017, # 19 Exhibit 19 - DS Article Jan 10 2017, # 20 Exhibit 20 - DS Article Jan 11 2017, # 21 Exhibit 21 - DS Article Jan 18 2017, # 22 Exhibit 22 - DS Article Jan 19 2017, # 23 Exhibit 23 - DS Article Jan 19 2017, # 24 Exhibit 24 - DS Article Jan 19 2017, # 25 Exhibit 25 - DS Article Feb 03 2017, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Ohio Docket, # 27 Exhibit 27 - CNN Article, # 28 Exhibit 28 - SPLC Page, # 29 Exhibit 29 - Wolman Declaration) (Randazza, Marc)
November 30, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Marc J. Randazza appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Randazza, Marc)
November 30, 2017 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Anglin. (Randazza, Marc)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/28/2017. (TXB)
November 28, 2017 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Jay M. Wolman appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wolman, Jay)
November 28, 2017 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 25 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Anglin. (Wolman, Jay)
November 15, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin Of Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stevenson, Mathew)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jay M. Wolman. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/15/2017. (APP)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marc J. Randazza. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/15/2017. (APP)
November 14, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE by Andrew Anglin of Errata (Stevenson, Mathew)
November 14, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION Marc J. Randazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900011672.) Mathew M. Stevenson appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Stevenson, Mathew)
November 14, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION Jay M. Wolman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900011672.) Mathew M. Stevenson appearing for Defendant Andrew Anglin Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Stevenson, Mathew)
November 14, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew M. Stevenson on behalf of Andrew Anglin (Stevenson, Mathew)
October 27, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE by Tanya Gersh Regarding Service of Process (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Dinielli, David)
September 22, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tanya Gersh re 17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve, Order on Motion to Vacate (Dinielli, David)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting re 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve and MOTION to Vacate Order Setting Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/18/2017. (APP)
September 15, 2017 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve MOTION to Vacate Order Setting Preliminary Pretrial Conference by David C. Dinielli, filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Emails to Randazza, # 2 Exhibit B - Bowles, To Sue Founder of Daily Stormer, a Neo-Nazi Site, First He Must Be Found, New York Times) (Dinielli, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve , MOTION to Vacate Order Setting Preliminary Pretrial Conference David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Dinielli, David)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve MOTION to Vacate Order Setting Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Tanya Gersh, PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER(Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/2/2017., Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/2/2017., Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/2/2017., Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 10:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch.), Motions terminated: 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve MOTION to Vacate Order Setting Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Tanya Gersh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/10/2017. (TCL)
July 7, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve , MOTION to Vacate Order Setting Preliminary Pretrial Conference David C. Dinielli appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Decl. Regarding Service, # 2 Exhibit B - Process Server Decls., # 3 Exhibit C - "SPLC is Suing Anglin! Donate Now to STOP THESE KIKES", # 4 Exhibit D - "Andrew Anglin has Retained America's #1 First Amendment Lawyer to Represent Him Against SPLC", # 5 Exhibit E - "First Amendment lawyer defending neo-Nazi website publisher", # 6 Exhibit F - Emails to Mr. Marc Randazza) (Dinielli, David)
May 1, 2017 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Morris Dees by Tanya Gersh. (Dinielli, David)
May 1, 2017 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Richard Cohen by Tanya Gersh. (Dinielli, David)
May 1, 2017 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David C. Dinielli by Tanya Gersh. (Dinielli, David)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/18/2017. (TCL)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/18/2017. (TCL)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/18/2017. (TCL)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/25/2017. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/25/2017. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/25/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/18/2017. (TCL)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION David C. Dinielli to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-1937987.) John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David C. Dinielli in Support) (Morrison, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION J. Richard Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-1937984.) John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Richard Cohen in Support) (Morrison, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION Morris Dees to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-1937973.) John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiff Tanya Gersh Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Morris Dees in Support) (Morrison, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Anglin. Original mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KJH)
April 18, 2017 Filing fee of $ 400 paid. Receipt number 0977-1937740. (KJH)
April 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Anglin, filed by Tanya Gersh. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gersh v. Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Gersh
Represented By: J. Richard Cohen
Represented By: Morris Dees
Represented By: David C. Dinielli
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?