Native Ecosystems Council et al v. Erickson et al
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council and Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: Mary Erickson, Leanne Marten, Thomas L. Tidwell and U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Case Number: 9:2017cv00053
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/27/2018. (ASG)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. (NOS)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Julie A. Weis for Meagher County, Montana, Julie A. Weis for Park County, Montana. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/27/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Native Ecosystems Council et al v. Erickson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council
Represented By: Thomas J. Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Thomas J. Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Marten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?