Prince v. INTUITIVE SURGICAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Leanne M. Prince
Defendant: INTUITIVE SURGICAL, INC. and Does 1-15
Case Number: 9:2017cv00058
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorney's fees. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/21/2018. (NOS)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation to Dismiss. The parties shall have until May 16, 2018, to file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/16/2018. (NOS)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Emily Reitmeier for Defendant. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/26/2017. Served on local counsel via CM/ECF. (ASG)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory D. Hull. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/18/2017. (NOS)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice subject to renewal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/14/2017. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. INTUITIVE SURGICAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne M. Prince
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTUITIVE SURGICAL, INC.
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: W. Scott Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?