Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 9:2017cv00064
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 Stipulation. After reviewing the parties stipulated fee settlement and finding good cause, the Court APPROVES and GRANTS the settlement. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/16/2018. (ASG)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/16/2018. (ASG)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Stay. If Alliance has not voluntarily dismissed this matter, EPA will respond to Alliance's complaint on or before February 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/11/2017. (ASG)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay. This action stayed in its entirety (including Defendant's September 18, 2017 deadline to respond to Plaintiff's complaint) until January 19, 2018 to allow the EPA to focus on the ongoing Section 7 consultation. If Plaintiff Alliance for the Wild Rockies has not voluntarily dismissed this matter, Defendant will respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/30/2017. (ASG)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re case management plan. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/6/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Kristine Marie Akland
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?