Peterman v. Republican National Committee

Plaintiff: Erika Peterman
Defendant: Republican National Committee
Case Number: 9:2017cv00066
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ASG)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/12/2019. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/14/2019. (ASG)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Motion to File Under Seal. The document lodged at Docket Number 44-1 shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/21/2018. (NOS)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I is DENIED and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/19/2018. (ASG)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - David Weslow for Defendant. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/6/2017. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterman v. Republican National Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Peterman
Represented By: Erin M. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republican National Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?