Runkle v. Rosauers Supermarkets, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Runkle
Defendant: Rosauers Supermarkets, Inc., Bob Burris, Ray Sprinkle and Steven Winterbauer
Case Number: 9:2017cv00069
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/30/2018. Copy mailed to Runkle. (ASG)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and rejecting in part 69 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/12/2018. Copy mailed to Runkle. (ASG)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER finding as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss. Ms. Runkles MHRA claims are considered dismissed without prejudice, and Defendants motions to dismiss denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/11/2017. (APP) Copy to Runkle
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/24/2017. (APP) Copy mailed to Runkle

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runkle v. Rosauers Supermarkets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Runkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosauers Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Winterbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?