United States of America v. Birdsong et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Malcolm Wayne Birdsong, M.W. Birdsong, Waynes' Group and Missoula County
Case Number: 9:2017cv00072
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: RAVALLI
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Birdsong's motion for a stay pending appeal (Doc. 53 ) is GRANTED and the requirement to post a bond or security is WAIVED. Enforcement of the Judgment (Doc. 50 ) and the Decree of Foreclosure and Order of Judicial Sale (Doc. 52 ) is STAYED pending resolution of Birdsong's appeal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/4/2019. (NOS)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECREE of Foreclosure and Order of Judicial Sale. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/20/2018. (NOS)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Defendant Malcolm Wayne Birdsong. (NOS)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION & ORDER. Order granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 35 Motion to Exclude Evidence. Judgment is entered in favor of the United States and against Defendant Malcolm Wayne Birdsong, fo r the outstanding federal income taxes for the 2003 to 2008 tax years (see Order for details). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall file a proposed order of foreclosure and judicial sale by December 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/4/2018. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Birdsong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Leif M. Johnson
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Wayne Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.W. Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waynes' Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missoula County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?