Blixseth v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Blixseth
Defendant: Stephen Brown, Garlington, Lohn & Robinson, PLLP and Does and Roes 1-100
Case Number: 9:2017cv00097
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/2/2018. (NOS)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants have until January 5, 2018, to file an Answer or responsive pleading in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report by December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/27/2017. (NOS)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve the defendants on or before November 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/15/2017. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blixseth v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Blixseth
Represented By: John C. Doubek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlington, Lohn & Robinson, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does and Roes 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?