Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Fish & Wildlife Service and Ryan Zinke
Intervenor_defendant: Montana Trappers Association, National Trappers Association and Fur Information Council of America
Case Number: 9:2017cv00099
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: XX out of state
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (NOS)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER consolidating cases. Defendant-Intervenors' request to intervene in the member case (CV 17-99-M-DWM) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall file their answers separately under the two respective case numbers in CM/ECF on or before 8/31/17. Thereafter, all parties shall file all documents in the lead case number CV 16-65-M-DWM and spread the particular documents to the member case. Proposed case management plan due on or before 9/25/17. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/9/2017. (NOS) (Modified to correct signature date.) (NOS)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a statement as to their position on consolidation with the WildEarth case on or before August 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/13/2017. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kristine Marie Akland
Represented By: Tanya M. Sanerib
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: Travis J. Annatoyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Travis J. Annatoyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Montana Trappers Association
Represented By: Gary R. Leistico
Represented By: W. Carl Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: National Trappers Association
Represented By: Gary R. Leistico
Represented By: W. Carl Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Fur Information Council of America
Represented By: Kathleen L. DeSoto
Represented By: Ira T. Kasdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?