Wohlers v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Wohlers
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 9:2017cv00122
Filed: September 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: RAVALLI
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. This Order shall serve as official approval of attorney Andrew T. Koenig's fees in the amount of $20,795.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, upon receipt of such fees, Mr. Koenig shall reimburse Wohlers in the amount of $7,900.00, representing fees Mr. Koenig has already received. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/4/2024. (ASG)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Jamie Lee Wohlers against Nancy A. Berryhill (APP)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS - granting 16 Social Security Opening Brief; adopting re 21 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/19/2018. (APP)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Strike the 7 Administrative Record and is to be replaced with the sealed certified administrative record to be filed before March 1, 2018, and granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File that Plaintiffs opening brief will be filed on or before March 31, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/1/2018. (APP)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/25/2018. (APP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wohlers v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Wohlers
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?