Garmin International, Inc. et al v. uAvionix, Corp.

Plaintiff: Garmin International, Inc. and Garmin USA, Inc.
Defendant: uAvionix, Corp.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00112
Filed: June 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for local counsel to appear telephonically at the deposition of the Defendant's expert witness. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/24/2019. (ASG)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Connor S. Houghton for Defendant. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/27/2018. (ASG)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Robert Shaffer for Defendant. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/14/2018. (ASG)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Carrie Bader for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/28/2018. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garmin International, Inc. et al v. uAvionix, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garmin International, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie A. Bader
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garmin USA, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie A. Bader
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uAvionix, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?