O'Neill et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Phillip Porter, Connie Crawford and Nancy O'Neill
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-XX, ABC Corporations I-XX and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 9:2018cv00118
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2018 12 Featured Case Order Setting: Dismissal Papers due by 8/31/2018. Motions terminated: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/31/2018. (dle)
July 30, 2018 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Connie Crawford, Nancy O'Neill, Phillip Porter (Puhrmann, Kai)
July 30, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including August 10, 2018, to file a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/30/2018. (ASG)
July 27, 2018 9 Submission of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Puhrmann, Kai)
July 27, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Kai Puhrmann appearing for Plaintiffs Connie Crawford, Nancy O'Neill, Phillip Porter (Puhrmann, Kai)
July 12, 2018 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in state court on June 11, 2018 by Nancy O'Neill, Connie Crawford, Phillip Porter. (ASG)
July 12, 2018 6 NOTICE of receipt of State Court File (via CD Rom). (Attachments: #1 Doc 1, #2 Doc 2, #3 Doc 3, #4 Doc 4, #5 Doc 5, #6 Doc 6, #7 Doc 8, #8 Doc 9, #9 Doc 10) (ASG)
July 10, 2018 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Crist, John)
July 10, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint John G. Crist appearing for Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Crist, John)
June 26, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Crist, John)
June 26, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Crist, John)
June 26, 2018 Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2154588. (NOS)
June 26, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-17-977 filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neill et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Porter
Represented By: Matthew B. Lowy
Represented By: Kai Puhrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Crawford
Represented By: Matthew B. Lowy
Represented By: Kai Puhrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy O'Neill
Represented By: Matthew B. Lowy
Represented By: Kai Puhrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: John G. Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?