Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC v. Atlantic Richfield Company
Plaintiff: Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv00131
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC re #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sylvi Sareva (Tietz, William)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sylvi Sareva. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/8/2018. (NOS) *Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (NOS)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION Sylvi Sareva to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2175949.) William John Tietz, III appearing for Plaintiff Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Sylvi Sareva) (Tietz, William)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eliot Lauer (Tietz, William)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Michael P. Jones withdrawing from the case, filed by Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC (Tietz, William)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michael P. Jones for Plaintiff. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/10/2018. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/26/2018. *Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Charles Howland. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/26/2018. (ASG)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Eliot Lauer for Plaintiff. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/10/2018. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/26/2018. *Served via CM/ECF upon local counsel. (ASG)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance and Response to Order re #7 Order by William John Tietz, III on behalf of Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC. (Tietz, William) (NOS).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Eliot Lauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 MOTION for Charles Howland to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and #5 MOTION for Michael Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS ORDERED that unless Plaintiff can show cause why additional counsel is necessary, Plaintiff is limited to the formal appearance of three attorneys of its choosing. Counsel must identify on or before July 24, 2018, its three attorneys of choice. The defendants will be similarly limited. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/17/2018. (NOS)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Richfield Company. Original given to plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION Michael Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2163725.) Catherine A. Laughner appearing for Plaintiff Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jones) (Laughner, Catherine)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION Charles Howland to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2163722.) Catherine A. Laughner appearing for Plaintiff Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Howland) (Laughner, Catherine)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION Eliot Lauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2163717.) Catherine A. Laughner appearing for Plaintiff Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Lauer) (Laughner, Catherine)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC. (Laughner, Catherine)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Richfield Company, filed by Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Facilities Manual, #3 Exhibit Production and Consumption Reports, #4 Exhibit Hydrological Data Summary, #5 Exhibit Report re Spent Potliner Disposal, #6 Exhibit Storm Water Pollution Prevention Plan, #7 Exhibit Report re Basic Dry Scrubber Operations, #8 Exhibit Agreement and Plan of Merger, #9 Exhibit 2/7/89 Analytical Results Report, #10 Exhibit Letter from Kenneth G. Reick to Frederick C. Shewman, P.E., #11 Exhibit Letter from Kenneth G. Reick to John Arrigo, #12 Exhibit Letter from Steve Wright, PE, to Tim Byron, #13 Exhibit Letter from Steve Wright, PE, to Mike Pasichnyk, #14 Exhibit Letter from Steve Wright, PE, to Mike Pasichnyk, #15 Exhibit Email from Robert Parker of EPA to Steve Wright, Jenny Chambers, and oth, #16 Exhibit Email from Jenny Chambers to Cheryl Driscoll, #17 Exhibit Proposed Administrative Order on Conse, #18 Exhibit Letter from Jenny Chambers to Cheryl Driscoll, #19 Exhibit Columbia Falls Aluminum Company Site, MDEQ- screenshot, #20 Exhibit Letter from Kelcey Land and Andrea Madigan to Steven Wright, #21 Exhibit Letter from Steve Wright to Kelcey Land and Andrea Madigan, #22 Exhibit Letter from Cord Harris to Kelcey Land and Andrea Madigan, #23 Exhibit Anaconda-Attachment 4 (Cost), #24 Exhibit RI/FS Work Plan, #25 Exhibit AOC, #26 Exhibit Data Summary Report,) (KJL)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2163499 (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC v. Atlantic Richfield Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Falls Aluminum Company, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A. Laughner
Represented By: William John Tietz, III
Represented By: Sylvi Sareva
Represented By: Eliot Lauer
Represented By: Michael P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?