Dickinson v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: James Glenn Dickinson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 9:2018cv00151
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa Wolf on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Wolf, Leisa)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons) (APP) Modified on 9/4/2018 to reflect original summons mailed to counsel (APP).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/29/2018. (TXB)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by James Glenn Dickinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summuns Berryhill, #3 Summons Sessions, #4 Summons Alme) (APP) Modified on 9/4/2018 to remove the word "Lodged" from entry (APP).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis James P. O'Brien appearing for Plaintiff James Glenn Dickinson. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Long Form, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickinson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Glenn Dickinson
Represented By: James P. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Leisa Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?