Strange v. Partners in Home Care, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Defendant: EMAILMEFORM, LLC, Michael Quan and Partners in Home Care, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00155
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Partners in Home Care, Inc. answer due 11/13/2018. (NOS)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 USM 285 and Summons Return Executed on 10/23/18. (NOS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Partners in Home Care, Inc. and delivered to USM-Enforcement email for service (APP)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Order for issuance and service of summons, and ORDER directing United States Marshal to serve summons and complaint on Defendant Partners in Home Care, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/15/2018. (TCL)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Issue Summons by Plaintiff Clinton Strange. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (TAG)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMAILMEFORM, LLC. (TAG)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING EFFORTS TO OBTAIN THE PHYSICAL ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT PARTY "EMAILMEFORM, LLC' filing by Clinton Strange (APP)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clinton Strange, Motions terminated: #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clinton Strange. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/21/2018. (TCL) Modified on 9/25/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Strange (APP).
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Party Michael Quan by Plaintiff Clinton Strange. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clinton Strange, Motions terminated: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clinton Strange., Order Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s); Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order. An answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order.( Waiver of Service due by 10/9/2018., Notice of Appearance due by 11/8/2018.), FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner filed by Clinton Strange. () Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service) (TCL) Modified on 9/7/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Strange and order/attachments to both defs (APP).
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Strange with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) Modified on 9/7/2018 to reflect removing "Lodged" from entry (APP).
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clinton Strange. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strange v. Partners in Home Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMAILMEFORM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Quan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners in Home Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?