Werner v. Teletech Services Corporation

Plaintiff: Monique A. Werner
Defendant: Teletech Services Corporation
Case Number: 9:2018cv00170
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Preliminary Pretrial Conference Nathan A. Schacht appearing for Defendant Teletech Services Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)) (Schacht, Nathan)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/20/2018. (NOS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents William E. Rideg appearing for Plaintiff Monique A. Werner (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rideg, William)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED, subject to renewal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/20/2018. (NOS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Documents William E. Rideg appearing for Plaintiff Monique A. Werner (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rideg, William)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/29/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/29/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/29/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 9:30 AM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/22/2018. (dle)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Teletech Services Corporation, filed by Monique A. Werner. (NOS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case originally filed in Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, as Cause No. DV 18-877C. (Attachments: #1 State court file) (NOS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teletech Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TTEC Holdings, Inc. for Teletech Services Corporation.. (Schacht, Nathan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Teletech Services Corporation. (Schacht, Nathan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Rideg regarding electronic registration. (NOS)
September 25, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2198606 (KJL)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Teletech Services Corporation from Montana Eleventh Judicial Court, Flathead County, case number DV 18-877C., filed by Teletech Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werner v. Teletech Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique A. Werner
Represented By: William E. Rideg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teletech Services Corporation
Represented By: Nathan A. Schacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?