Barker et al
Petitioner: Paul Kenny, Chuck Fyfe, Travis Hill, Davis B. Harris, Matt Barker, Rick Hajek, Robert Mattijetz, Damian Edwards, Dwayne Binkley, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Randy Hill, Ken Durie, Jason Gordon, Randall Doane, Mike Conrad, Terril Bernhardt, Mike Gates, Thomas Hartzell, Ryan Ewer, Graham Hyde, Daniel Endecott, Mark Boesch, Mike Ellen, Don Whitehair, Dennis K. Ramey, Bruce Miller, Randy Phillips, Steve Tenold, Isaac Milstead, Dan Waldo, Allen Schmidt, David Nordman, Brett Sharbono, Lester Meinzen, Kenneth Tichenor, Miles Rauer, Joni Solander, Rob Sims, Mark Miller, Jason Spek, Erin Messex, Roger Stevens, William Smead, Ki Stoddard, Patrick Wurster, Marvin Snedigar, Chris McPherson, Richard Wayne Summers, Michael Ryker, Gregory Rauer, Jeff Mcchristian and Zach Titeca
Respondent: Selway Corportaion Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Selway Corporation
Intervenor: Max Downing
Case Number: 9:2018cv00179
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mailing Motion to Approve Settlement) (Amsden, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #12 Order Setting,, Terminate Motions, OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN THE MISSOULIAN NEWSPAPER by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster. (Amsden, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #12 Order Setting,, Terminate Motions, OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN RAVALLI REPUBLIC NEWSPAPER by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster. (Amsden, John)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster re #12 Order Setting,, Terminate Motions, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mailing Notice of Settlement) (Amsden, John)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Downing's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/26/2018. (ASG)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting #10 motion and setting hearing on final approval of the settlement and entry of judgment and a bar order for 1/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/26/2018. (ASG)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 Unopposed MOTION FOR (1) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF REPLACEMENT ESOP TRUSTEE; (3) APPROVAL OF FORM AND TIMING OF PROPOSED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND OPPORTUNITY TO OBJECT; (4) APPROVAL OF PROPRIETY OF BAR OR DER; AND (5) SETTING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL filed by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rpt Abdrasilova, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rpt Hegger, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rpt Krenzel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Settlement Term Sheet) (Amsden, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION FOR (1) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; (2) APPOINTMENT OF REPLACEMENT ESOP TRUSTEE; (3) APPROVAL OF FORM AND TIMING OF PROPOSED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND OPPORTUNITY TO OBJECT; (4) APPROVAL OF PROPRIETY OF BAR ORDER; AND (5) SETTING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL John L. Amsden appearing for Petitioners Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Settlement, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Amsden, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Max Downing. (NOS)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene. Robert T. Bell appearing for Proposed Intervenor Max Downing. (NOS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #1 Complaint,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Term Sheet) (Amsden, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Cotner on behalf of Selway Corporation (Cotner, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Cotner on behalf of Selway Corporation (Cotner, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint,,, #2 Summons Issued ON BEHALF OF SELWAY CORPORATION EMPLOYEE STOCK OWNERSHIP PLAN Acknowledgement filed by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster. (Amsden, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint,,, #2 Summons Issued ON BEHALF OF SELWAY CORPORATION Acknowledgement filed by Matt Barker, Terril Bernhardt, Dwayne Binkley, Mark Boesch, Mike Conrad, Randall Doane, Ken Durie, Damian Edwards, Mike Ellen, Daniel Endecott, Ryan Ewer, Chuck Fyfe, Mike Gates, Jason Gordon, Rick Hajek, Davis B. Harris, Thomas Hartzell, Randy Hill, Travis Hill, Graham Hyde, Tyler Jarvis, Gerald Jelletich, Paul Kenny, Robert Mattijetz, Chris McPherson, Jeff Mcchristian, Lester Meinzen, Erin Messex, Bruce Miller, Mark Miller, Isaac Milstead, David Nordman, Randy Phillips, Dennis K. Ramey, Gregory Rauer, Miles Rauer, Michael Ryker, Allen Schmidt, Brett Sharbono, Rob Sims, William Smead, Marvin Snedigar, Joni Solander, Jason Spek, Roger Stevens, Ki Stoddard, Richard Wayne Summers, Steve Tenold, Kenneth Tichenor, Zach Titeca, Dan Waldo, Don Whitehair, Patrick Wurster. (Amsden, John)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Selway Corporation, Selway Corportaion Employee Stock Ownership Plan. Originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
October 19, 2018 Filing fee of $400 received. Receipt number 0977-2211645 (KJL)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selway Corporation, Selway Corportaion Employee Stock Ownership Plan, filed by Randy Phillips, Isaac Milstead, Tyler Jarvis, Ken Durie, Jeff Mcchristian, Thomas Hartzell, Terril Bernhardt, Matt Barker, Randy Hill, Mark Miller, Davis B. Harris, Joni Solander, David Nordman, Chris McPherson, Lester Meinzen, Rob Sims, Graham Hyde, Jason Gordon, Steve Tenold, Robert Mattijetz, Daniel Endecott, Bruce Miller, Gregory Rauer, Ryan Ewer, Don Whitehair, Richard Wayne Summers, Gerald Jelletich, Roger Stevens, Mike Gates, Paul Kenny, Erin Messex, Randall Doane, Kenneth Tichenor, Brett Sharbono, Miles Rauer, Dwayne Binkley, Zach Titeca, Mike Ellen, William Smead, Chuck Fyfe, Ki Stoddard, Rick Hajek, Dan Waldo, Allen Schmidt, Damian Edwards, Mark Boesch, Dennis K. Ramey, Jason Spek, Michael Ryker, Marvin Snedigar, Travis Hill, Patrick Wurster, Mike Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Kenny
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chuck Fyfe
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Hill
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Davis B. Harris
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matt Barker
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rick Hajek
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Mattijetz
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damian Edwards
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwayne Binkley
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyler Jarvis
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Jelletich
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Hill
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ken Durie
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Gordon
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Doane
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Conrad
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terril Bernhardt
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Gates
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Hartzell
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Ewer
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Graham Hyde
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Endecott
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Boesch
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Ellen
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Don Whitehair
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis K. Ramey
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Miller
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Phillips
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Tenold
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isaac Milstead
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dan Waldo
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Schmidt
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Nordman
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett Sharbono
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lester Meinzen
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Tichenor
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miles Rauer
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joni Solander
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rob Sims
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Miller
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Spek
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erin Messex
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roger Stevens
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Smead
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ki Stoddard
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Wurster
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Snedigar
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chris McPherson
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Wayne Summers
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Ryker
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Rauer
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Mcchristian
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zach Titeca
Represented By: John L. Amsden
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Selway Corportaion Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Selway Corporation
Represented By: David B. Cotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Max Downing
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?