Kennedy v. Trumbull Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Connie Kennedy
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv00180
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Mark Kovacich, John M. Wagner, Patrick M. Sullivan. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/24/2018. (APP)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trumbull Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Connie Kennedy. Trumbull Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Kovacich, Mark)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/29/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/29/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/29/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/29/2018. (TXB)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trumbull Insurance Company. Original mailed to counsel Kovacich (TAG)
October 26, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2215385 (TAG)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trumbull Insurance Company, filed by Connie Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Trumbull Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Kennedy
Represented By: Mark Kovacich
Represented By: John M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?