Worrall v. Power Engineers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Worrall
Defendant: Power Engineers, Inc., Power Constructors, Inc. and Power Testing and Energization, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00189
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
0 Judge: Dana L Christensen
1 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Power Constructors, Inc., Power Engineers, Inc., Power Testing and Energization, Inc. re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ashby, D.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - D. John Ashby for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/9/2019. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)
January 8, 2019 9 MOTION D. John Ashby to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2246504.) Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Defendants Power Constructors, Inc., Power Engineers, Inc., Power Testing and Energization, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Roth, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 8 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings) (APP)
December 20, 2018 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Worrall. (APP)
December 11, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Power Constructors, Inc., Power Engineers, Inc., Power Testing and Energization, Inc.. (Roth, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Order Vacating January 22, 2019 pretrial conference and all associated deadlines. PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER(Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/30/2019., Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/30/2019., Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/30/2019., Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/10/2018. (TCL)
November 29, 2018 4 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Jeffrey M. Roth, Mark R. Feddes, Philip L. McGrady. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/17/2018. (APP)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/15/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/15/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/15/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/26/2018. (TCL)
November 21, 2018 2 Disclosure Statement by Power Constructors, Inc., Power Engineers, Inc., Power Testing and Energization, Inc.. (Roth, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2226534. (NOS)
November 20, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Twentieth Judicial District Court, Sanders County, case number DV 18-93 filed by Power Constructors, Inc., Power Engineers, Inc., Power Testing and Energization, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worrall v. Power Engineers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Worrall
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Mark R. Feddes
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Mark R. Feddes
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Testing and Energization, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Mark R. Feddes
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?