Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Welcov Healthcare, LLC
Plaintiff: Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Welcov Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 9:2018cv00191
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Monida Healthcare Network for Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC.. (McFarland, Dylan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC. Welcov Healthcare, LLC waiver sent on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (McFarland, Dylan)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Welcov Healthcare, LLC. Originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
November 21, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2226793 (KJL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Welcov Healthcare, LLC, filed by Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Welcov Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monida Healthcare Staffing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Dylan McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welcov Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?