Burns v. Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Burns
Defendant: Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00200
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc. re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Yap, Julie)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc. re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Tran, Tiffany)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/14/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/14/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/14/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 3:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/29/2019. (dle)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany T. Tran ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julie G. Yap. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/25/2019. (NOS)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION Julie G. Yap to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2254871.) John G. Crist appearing for Defendant Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Crist, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION Tiffany T. Tran to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2254862.) John G. Crist appearing for Defendant Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Crist, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Crist, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Crist, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Certificate of Notice to Clerk of Court (Crist, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Crist, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing fee of $ 400 received. Receipt number 0977-2237638 (KJL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV 18-1390., filed by Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shire Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John G. Crist
Represented By: Tiffany T. Tran
Represented By: Julie G. Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Burns
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaleva
Represented By: Elizabeth A. O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?