Hart et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Robert Hart and Kerry Ellen Hart
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv00008
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - RE-SETTING: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/20/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/20/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/20/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/27/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Motions terminated: #11 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/7/2019. (dle)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Randall G. Nelson appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Nelson, Randall)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Sheehy on behalf of Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Sheehy, Martha)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Kerry Ellen Hart, Robert Hart. (Casillas, Joseph)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Kerry Ellen Hart, Robert Hart. (Casillas, Joseph)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/14/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/14/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/14/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/12/2019. (dle)
January 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Nelson, Randall)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Kerry Ellen Hart, Robert Hart REGARDING REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT (Casillas, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company filed by Robert Hart, Kerry Ellen Hart. (NOS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company filed by Robert Hart, Kerry Ellen Hart. (NOS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court File. Case originally filed in Montana Twenty-First Judicial District Court, Ravalli County, cause number DV-18-499/1. (NOS)
January 8, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2245960. (ASG)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company from Montana Twenty-First Judicial District Court Ravalli County, case number DV-18-499. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hart
Represented By: Joseph Ray Casillas
Represented By: Gregory A. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Ellen Hart
Represented By: Joseph Ray Casillas
Represented By: Gregory A. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?