Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity and Rock Creek Alliance
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Chad W. Benson and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Intervenor Defendant: RC Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00020
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by RC Resources, Inc.. (Lopach, Paul)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. RC Resources shall re-file its answer as a separate docket entry in the case. The caption is modified. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/14/2019. (ASG)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Proposed Defendant-Intervenor RC Resources, Inc. (NOS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene. Paul J. Lopach appearing for Proposed Defendant-Intervenor RC Resources, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (NOS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin, Montana Environmental Information Center, Rock Creek Alliance, Sierra Club. (O'Brien, Katherine)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity, Rock Creek Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club, Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin, Montana Environmental Information Center. All Defendants. (O'Brien, Katherine)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin, Montana Environmental Information Center, Rock Creek Alliance, Sierra Club re #4 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Forsyth, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/15/2019. Case Management Plan due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/28/2019. (NOS)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth B. Forsyth. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/28/2019. (NOS)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Elizabeth B. Forsyth to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2255171.) Katherine K. O'Brien appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin, Montana Environmental Information Center, Rock Creek Alliance, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Elizabeth Forsyth, #2 Exhibit Forsyth Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Katherine)
January 25, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2254954. (ASG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to counsel. (ASG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Rock Creek Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club, Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin, Montana Environmental Information Center. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin et al v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ksanka Kupaqa Xa'lcin
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Creek Alliance
Represented By: Katherine K. O'Brien
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad W. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: RC Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Lopach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?