Stokes v. LSF8 Participation Trust et al

Appellee: Kathleen A. McCallister, Montana Department of Revenue and LSF8 Participation Trust
Appellant: John Patrick Stokes
Case Number: 9:2019cv00027
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND ORDER ON MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL re #4 Objection/Response. IT IS ORDERED that this Court's February 11, 2019, Order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Doc. 3, stands. No further filings will be accepted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/14/2019. (Copy to Stokes and BAP via NEF.) (NOS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Objection/Response opposing Order by Appellant John Patrick Stokes. (Document originally filed in BAP case 18-1293 as Doc. 23 and forwarded by BAP to U.S. District Court - Butte, MT.) (NOS) (Modified on 2/12/19; copy to Stokes via NEF.) (NOS)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 )is DENIED and the Court CERTIFIES that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Having fulfilled the transfer mandate, no further filings will be accepted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/11/2019. (Copy of Order to BAP and Stokes.) (NOS)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Appellant John Patrick Stokes (Attachments: #1 Appeal documents) (CDH)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER by BAP transferring motion to U.S. District Court for limited purpose of ruling on motion under 28 U.S.C. 1915. (copy of order mailed to pro se appellant, Stokes this date). (CDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. LSF8 Participation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kathleen A. McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: Teresa Grace Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LSF8 Participation Trust
Represented By: Jason James Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Patrick Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?