United States of America v. Rowe et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Collection Services Bureau, Inc., DeeAnn Rowe and Lincoln County
Case Number: 9:2019cv00032
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. DeeAnn Rowe served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to DeeAnn Rowe. (Original to U.S. Attorney's Office.) (NOS)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION between United States and Lincoln County by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Lincoln County waiver sent on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Collection Services Bureau, Inc. waiver sent on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lincoln County Attorney, Marcia Boris on 2/14/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 3/15/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Collection Bureau Services, Inc. on 2/14/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 3/15/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DeeAnn Rowe on 2/14/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 3/15/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Services Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeeAnn Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?