Guinnane et al v. Dobbins et al

Plaintiff: Katherine Guinnane and Guinnane Ranch, LLC
Defendant: Nancy Dobbins, John Does 1-5, EAN Holdings, LLC and Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv00085
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Defendant Nancy Dobbins' Response To Ean Holdings And Enterprise Rac Company Of Montana/Wyomings Motion To Dismiss filed by Nancy Dobbins. (Sullivan, Patrick)
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Katherine Guinnane, Guinnane Ranch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Logerstedt v. Fourth Judicial District) (Geddes, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC. (Baldridge, J.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) J. Douglas Baldridge appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Baldridge, J.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Nancy Dobbins. (Sullivan, Patrick)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Dismiss as MOOT. Defendants may file a renewed motion or Answer on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/7/2019. (NOS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy Dobbins, EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC, John Does 1-5, filed by Guinnane Ranch, LLC, Katherine Guinnane. (Geddes, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Katherine Guinnane, Guinnane Ranch, LLC (Geddes, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC. (Colbert, Randall)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Randall J. Colbert appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Colbert, Randall)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk of Court to PHV Counsel Baldridge and Randles regarding CM/ECF registration. (NOS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC Theodore B. Randles (Colbert, Randall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC J. Douglas Baldridge (Colbert, Randall)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore B. Randles. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/16/2019. (NOS)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Douglas Baldridge. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/16/2019. (NOS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Theodore B. Randles to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2309416.) Randall J. Colbert appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Theodore B. Randles, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Randles) (Colbert, Randall)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION J. Douglas Baldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2309400.) Randall J. Colbert appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Douglas Baldridge, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Baldridge) (Colbert, Randall)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Nancy Dobbins. (NOS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Nancy Dobbins, EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC, John Does 1-5, filed by Guinnane Ranch, LLC, Katherine Guinnane. (NOS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE (via email from Missoula County). (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons Issued - Dobbins, #2 3 - Summons Issued - EAN Holdings LLC, #3 4 - Summons Issued - Enterprise RAC, #4 5 - Summons Served - Dobbins, #5 6 - Waiver of Service - Guinnane Ranch, #6 8 - Waiver of Service - EAN Holdings, #7 9- Waiver of Service - Enterprise RAC, #8 10 - Notice of Filing Removal, #9 11 - Notice of Removal) (NOS)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC. (Colbert, Randall)
May 9, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2307453. (ASG)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-979. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Acknowledgment and Waiver EAN, #3 Ex C - Acknowledgment and Waiver Enterprise, #4 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinnane et al v. Dobbins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Dobbins
Represented By: Patrick M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Randall J. Colbert
Represented By: Theodore B. Randles
Represented By: J. Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC
Represented By: Randall J. Colbert
Represented By: Theodore B. Randles
Represented By: J. Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Guinnane
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Represented By: Hallie E. Bishop
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guinnane Ranch, LLC
Represented By: James Devlan Geddes
Represented By: Hallie E. Bishop
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?