Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes v. Lake County Board of Commissioners et al

Plaintiff: Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes
Defendant: Lori Lundeen and Lake County Board of Commissioners
Case Number: 9:2019cv00090
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER:Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/15/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/15/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/15/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 3:00 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/19/2019. (dle)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Text Order granting #35 joint motion. The preliminary injunction hearing previously set for July 19th at 1:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/15/2019. (NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED) (ASG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Lake County Board of Commissioners re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Edelman, Spencer)
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Injunction Hearing James H. Goetz appearing for Plaintiff Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, #2 Stipulation) (Goetz, James)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #30 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/9/2019. (ASG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 33 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Lundeen and Lake County filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Goetz, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Lundeen and Lake County James H. Goetz appearing for Plaintiff Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes (Goetz, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #30 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Prior to Preliminary Injunction HearingEmergency MOTION to Expedite Such Discovery filed by Lake County Board of Commissioners. (Edelman, Spencer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Prior to Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Emergency MOTION to Expedite Such Discovery Spencer L. Edelman appearing for Counter Claimant Lake County Board of Commissioners (Edelman, Spencer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Goetz, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes . (Decker, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Christina M. Courville withdrawing from the case, filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes (Courville, Christina)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Goetz on behalf of Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes (Goetz, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, Luke W. Holmen by Spencer L. Edelman on behalf of Lake County Board of Commissioners (Edelman, Spencer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, of Deana M. Bennett by Spencer L. Edelman on behalf of Lake County Board of Commissioners (Edelman, Spencer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission by Spencer L. Edelman on behalf of Lake County Board of Commissioners (Edelman, Spencer)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/19/2019. (dle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Lori Lundeen NOTICE RE: LAKE COUNTY'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Casillas, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lake County Board of Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Big Arm School Natl Register of Historic Places) (Edelman, Spencer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Spencer L. Edelman appearing for Counter Claimant Lake County Board of Commissioners (Edelman, Spencer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lake County Board of Commissioners. (Edelman, Spencer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Ray Casillas on behalf of Lori Lundeen (Casillas, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANT LORI LUNDEEN'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes by Lori Lundeen. (Lyons, Jenna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lori Lundeen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Lyons, Jenna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF LORI LUNDEEN by Lori Lundeen. (Casillas, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Lake County Board of Commissioners (Congdon, Walter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes by Lake County Board of Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 August 5, 1930 Opinion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 January 20, 1966 DOI Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 April 14, 1966 DOI Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 FOF COL of December 27 1968) (Edelman, Spencer)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice: re #7 MOTION Luke W. Holmen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX100016229.), #8 MOTION Spencer L. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX100016229.), #9 MOTION Deana M. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX100016229.), #6 Notice of Appearance, #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,. Name of attorney whose NEF was undeliverable: Christina M. Courville. (MRC)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Deana Bennett, Spencer Edelman, and Luke Holmen (Docs. #7 , #8 , #9 ). Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/10/2019. (CM/ECF service on local Counsel Congdon.) (NOS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Deana M. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX100016229.) Walter E. Congdon appearing for Defendant Lake County Board of Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Congdon, Walter)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Spencer L. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX100016229.) Walter E. Congdon appearing for Defendant Lake County Board of Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Congdon, Walter)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Luke W. Holmen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX100016229.) Walter E. Congdon appearing for Defendant Lake County Board of Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Congdon, Walter)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter E. Congdon on behalf of Lake County Board of Commissioners (Congdon, Walter)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Courville, Christina)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Christina M. Courville appearing for Plaintiff Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes (Courville, Christina)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. All Defendants. (Courville, Christina)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lake County Board of Commissioners, Lori Lundeen. (Original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
May 24, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2314323. (NOS)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lake County Board of Commissioners, Lori Lundeen filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1913 Plat, #2 Exhibit B - File 304 Elimination, #3 Exhibit C - SOI Restoration, #4 Exhibit D - BIA TSR, #5 Exhibit E - Cty Mtg Minutes, #6 Exhibit F - Cty Cond Approval, #7 Exhibit G - Cty Section map, #8 Exhibit H - CSKT Aerial Photo, #9 Exhibit I - CSKT Ltr to Cty, #10 Exhibit J - CSKT Ltr to Pln Dpt, #11 Exhibit K - Legal Notice 1, #12 Exhibit L - Amd Access Map, #13 Exhibit M - CSKT Ltr to Cty Atty, #14 Exhibit N - Lands Dept Rpt and Photos, #15 Exhibit O - BIA Notice Tpass, #16 Exhibit P - Legal Notice 2, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes v. Lake County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes
Represented By: Daniel J. Decker
Represented By: Shane A. Morigeau
Represented By: John T. Harrison
Represented By: Christina M. Courville
Represented By: James H. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lundeen
Represented By: Jenna P. Lyons
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Spencer L. Edelman
Represented By: Deanna M. Bennett
Represented By: Walter E. Congdon
Represented By: Luke W. Holmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?