Christensen v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Helen Christensen
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 9:2019cv00093
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/20/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/20/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/20/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/29/2019. (dle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Davis Selected Advisers for Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Gerdrum, Jill)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant COSTCO Wholesale Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Gerdrum, Jill)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Christensen. Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service) (Suenram, Jacy)
June 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2318917 (KJL)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. (KJL)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Helen Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Christensen
Represented By: Mark Kovacich
Represented By: Jacy D. Suenram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Jill M. Gerdrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?